EP1429730 - OPIOID FORMULATIONS HAVING REDUCED POTENTIAL FOR ABUSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Penwest Pharmaceuticals Company 2981 Route 22 Patterson, NY 12563-9970 / US | [2004/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAICHWAL, Anand, R. 5 Kendall Drive Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 02 /
MCCALL, Troy, W. 8861 Three Chimneys Drive East Germantown, TN 38138 / US | 03 /
WOODCOCK, Paul, M. 31 Mist Hill Drive Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Lau, Sarah Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Lau, Sarah Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/26] | Bassil, Nicholas Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02773571.1 | 25.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002US30393 | Priority number, date | US20010324546P | 26.09.2001 Original published format: US 324546 P | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03026743 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1429730 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K9/50, // A61K9/20, A61K9/28 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
A61K9/205 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61K9/2009 (EP,US);
A61K9/2013 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K9/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPIOID-FORMULIERUNGEN MIT VERRINGERTEM MISSBRAUCHSPOTENZIAL | [2004/26] | English: | OPIOID FORMULATIONS HAVING REDUCED POTENTIAL FOR ABUSE | [2004/26] | French: | FORMULATIONS D'OPIOIDES PRESENTANT UN POTENTIEL REDUIT POUR DES UTILISATIONS ABUSIVES | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 17.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/30] | 11.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9528916 (MENDELL CO INC EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-11,13-15,18-23,25 * abstract * * examples 1-3 * * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 33 * * page 7, line 7 - line 32 * * page 12, line 23 - line 25 * * claims 10,11 *[I] 4,5,12,16,17,24,26-33; | [XI]US5958456 (BAICHWAL ANAND [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-13,26,27,30-33 * abstract * * examples 1-12 * * column 6, lines 1-22,46-65 * * column 8, lines 29-30 * [I] 3,5,14-25,28,29 | International search | [Y]US6245357 (EDGREN DAVID E [US], et al) | Examination | WO0108661 |