EP1436294 - TETRACYCLIC AZAINDOLES AND -INDOLINES HAVING SEROTONIN 5-HT2C ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | [2005/18] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Jian-Min 5123 Heathrow Avenue Kalamazoo, MI 49009 / US | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02773791.5 | 15.10.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US33176 | Priority number, date | US20010335081P | 18.10.2001 Original published format: US 335081 P | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03033497 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436294 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/06, A61K31/55, A61K31/535, A61P25/00 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
C07D498/22 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
C07D513/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | 05.05.2004 | LT | 05.05.2004 | LV | 05.05.2004 | MK | 05.05.2004 | RO | 05.05.2004 | SI | 05.05.2004 | Title | German: | TETRACYCLISCHE AZAINDOLE UND -INDOLINE MIT SEROTONIN 5-HT2C AKTIVITÄT | [2004/29] | English: | TETRACYCLIC AZAINDOLES AND -INDOLINES HAVING SEROTONIN 5-HT2C ACTIVITY | [2004/29] | French: | TETRACYCLIQUES AZAINDOLES ET INDOLINES MODULANT L'ACTIVITE DE 5-HT | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 11.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/26] | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/26] | Request for further processing for: | 27.05.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.06.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0064899 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [A] 1-43* abstract *; | [XD]WO0077002 (DU PONT PHARM CO [US]) [XD] 1-43 * examples, especially no. 128, 129, 149 of table 2A; page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 11 * |