EP1446478 - DIMERIZED GROWTH FACTOR AND MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | [2004/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOORE, Margaret, D. 7771 57th Avenue Northeast Seattle, WA 98115 / US | 02 /
FOX, Brian, A. 3925 Woodlawn Ave North Seattle, WA 98103 / US | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/34] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02773824.4 | 18.10.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002US33563 | Priority number, date | US20010346117P | 19.10.2001 Original published format: US 346117 P | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03033677 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1446478 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446478 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/10, C12N15/16, C12N15/63, C07K14/47, C07K14/575 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
C07K14/49 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US);
C12N2799/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIMERISIERTER WACHSTUMSFAKTOR SOWIE MATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2004/34] | English: | DIMERIZED GROWTH FACTOR AND MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR PRODUCING IT | [2004/34] | French: | FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DIMERISE ET MATERIAUX ET PROCEDES UTILISES POUR SA PRODUCTION | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 24.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.01.2008 | CZ | 23.01.2008 | EE | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | SK | 23.01.2008 | TR | 23.01.2008 | BG | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
TR | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
BG | 23.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0325224 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [A] 1-17* claims 9-21 *; | [A] - BERGSTEN E ET AL, "PDGF-D IS A SPECIFIC, PROTEASE-ACTIVATED LIGAND FOR THE PDGF BETA-RECEPTOR", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, MACMILLAN PUBLISHERS, GB, (200105), vol. 3, no. 5, ISSN 1465-7392, pages 512 - 516, XP001053431 [A] 1-17 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35074588 | International search | [A]WO0027879 (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US], et al) |