EP1458549 - POLYPROPYLENE CONTAINER AND PROCESS FOR MAKING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Change - representative | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PECHINEY EMBALLAGE FLEXIBLE EUROPE 1, rue de l'Union 92843 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2004/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHARDS, Guy 5022 Island View Drive Oshkosh, WI 54901 / US | 02 /
RASHID, A., B., M., Bazlur 2173 Bramblewood Court Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 03 /
KNOLL, Robert, W. 1221 Westbreeze Drive Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 04 /
EMRE, Sahin 408 West Crossing Meadows Appleton, WI 54913 / US | 05 /
CURIE, Kevin, James 2174 Sunrise Drive Appleton, WI 54914 / US | 06 /
DAVIDSON, Randolph, Lee 1249 Apple Court Menasha, WI 54952 / US | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/39] | Hill, Justin John McDermott, Will & Emery, 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02773876.4 | 23.10.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002US33961 | Priority number, date | US20010046500 | 24.10.2001 Original published format: US 46500 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03035368 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1458549 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/06, B32B27/08, B32B27/32 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
B29B11/14 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (KR);
B29C49/071 (EP,US);
B29C49/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B65D1/0215 (EP,US);
B65D1/0223 (EP,US);
B29B11/08 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,US);
B29C2049/7879 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/072 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0723 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0724 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0725 (EP,US);
B29C2949/073 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0732 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0733 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0762 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0771 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0773 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0774 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0777 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0811 (EP);
B29C2949/0817 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0818 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0819 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0826 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0828 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0831 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0835 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0836 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0862 (EP,US);
B29C2949/22 (EP,US);
B29C2949/24 (EP,US);
B29C2949/26 (EP,US);
B29C2949/28 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3008 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3009 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3012 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3016 (EP,US);
B29C2949/302 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3022 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3026 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3028 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3034 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3036 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3092 (EP,US);
B29C35/08 (EP,US);
B29C49/0005 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/087 (EP);
B29C49/1215 (EP,US);
B29C49/42832 (EP);
B29C49/6418 (EP,US);
B29C49/6445 (EP,US);
B29C49/6605 (EP);
B29K2023/086 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2623/086 (EP,US);
B29K2623/12 (EP,US);
B29K2995/004 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0067 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0069 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7158 (EP,US);
B29L2031/716 (EP,US);
B65D2501/0036 (EP,US);
Y10T428/13 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/39] | B29C49/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYPROPYLENBEHÄLTER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2004/39] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE CONTAINER AND PROCESS FOR MAKING IT | [2004/39] | French: | RECIPIENT EN POLYPROPYLENE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 24.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/14] | Divisional application(s) | EP09151893.6 / EP2047966 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5011720 (JABARIN SALEH A [US]); | [A]WO9520487 (DU PONT [US]); | [X]WO0063085 (PECHINEY PLASTIC PACKAGING INC [US], et al); | [PX]WO0198386 (ATOFINA [FR], et al) | International search | [Y]US3878033 (ZAVASNIK FREDERICK); | [Y]US3950459 (SEEFLUTH CHARLES L); | [Y]US6248413 (BAREL MORENO [IT], et al) |