EP1389906 - DEVICE FOR ACOUSTIC RODENT CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MULTITECNO S.r.l. Via ITA MARZOTTO 8 30025 Fossalta Di Portogruaro (Prov. of Venezia) / IT | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states MULTITECNO S.r.l. Via ITA MARZOTTO 8 30025 Fossalta Di Portogruaro (Prov. of Venezia) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REATTI, Guido Via Jacopo Filiasi, 55 I-35128 Padova / IT | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/09] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02774019.0 | 16.05.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002EP05427 | Priority number, date | IT2001PD00124 | 29.05.2001 Original published format: IT PD20010124 | [2007/05] |
Former [2004/09] | IT2001PD00012 | 29.05.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02096196 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1389906 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1389906 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01M29/02, H02J1/06 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
A01M29/18 (EP,US);
H02J1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKUSTISCHESNAGETIERBEKÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2004/09] | English: | DEVICE FOR ACOUSTIC RODENT CONTROL | [2004/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LUTTE SONORE CONTRE LES RONGEURS | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 12.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2007 | BE | 21.02.2007 | CH | 21.02.2007 | CY | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | FI | 21.02.2007 | FR | 21.02.2007 | LI | 21.02.2007 | NL | 21.02.2007 | TR | 21.02.2007 | IE | 16.05.2007 | LU | 16.05.2007 | GB | 21.05.2007 | SE | 21.05.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
LU | 16.05.2007 | ||
GB | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
GB | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
FR | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
GB | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
GB | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
FR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
FR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
FR | 12.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
BE | 21.02.2007 | ||
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CH | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 21.02.2007 | |
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
LI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3879702 (MANCONE JOSEPH G) [X] 1,4,7,9,10 * column 1, line 53 - line 65 * * column 3, line 11 - column 5, line 26 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]DE2917832 (KUNZ KURT) [X] 12 * page 9 - page 17 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]GB2071889 (STEEL M) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 15 - line 120 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4771403 (MASKOVYAK GEORGE D [US], et al) [Y] 14-17 * abstract * * figures 1-4,21 * * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 28 ** column 4, line 57 - column 9, line 35 *; | [A]EP0282673 (ELEXIS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 35 - line 46 * * figure 2 *; | [A]FR2621771 (HELLMANN SPEZIALPRODUKTE JOACH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 17 - page 10, line 13 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0376738 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) [Y] 13 * abstract * * figures 5,6 *; | [XY]US5191520 (ECKERSLEY GREGORY P [AU]) [X] 12 * the whole document * [Y] 13-17; | [A]US5278537 (CARLO LOUIS D [US], et al) [A] 4,5 * column 5, line 7 - column 10, line 42 * * figures 2-5 *; | [X]DE4224755 (BUDIG PETER KLAUS PROF DR SC T [DE]) [X] 12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5477091 (FIORINA JEAN-NOEL [FR], et al) [A] 12,14 * abstract * * figure - *; | [X]WO0103279 (ADVANCED ENERGY IND INC [US], et al) [X] 12 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US6212088 (YOO WOO SIK [US]) [X] 12 * abstract * * figures 1B-4 * | by applicant | IT1288012 | IT1000124 |