EP1385739 - TRACTION KITE DESIGN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lynn, Peter Robert 105 Alford Forest Road Ashburton Christchurch / NZ | [2008/33] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Lynn, Peter Robert 105 Alford Forest Road Ashburton, Christchurch / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/06] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02774080.2 | 02.04.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002NZ00054 | Priority number, date | NZ20010510825 | 29.03.2001 Original published format: NZ 51082501 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02096753 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1385739 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1385739 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 05.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B64C31/06, B63B35/79, A63H27/08 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
B64C31/06 (EP,US);
B63H8/12 (EP);
B64C2031/065 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/06] | B64C31/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONZEPT FÜR EINEN ZUGDRACHEN | [2004/06] | English: | TRACTION KITE DESIGN | [2004/06] | French: | CONCEPTION DE CERF-VOLANT DE TRACTION | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 23.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | BE | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | IT | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | IE | 02.04.2009 | LU | 02.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
LU | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 02.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
IT | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 13.08.2008 | |
ES | 24.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB190704033 (TASKER EDWARD ERNEST) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US4530477 (ITO TOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]FR2750885 (INT TECHNIC SAILS WIND TIME [FR]) [A] 1-10* page 3, lines 4-13; figure 2 * | International search | [AP]WO0158755 (LYNN PETER ROBERT [NZ]) |