EP1404345 - SKIN-PERMEABLE SELECTIVE CYCLOOXYGENASE-2 INHIBITOR COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia Corporation 100 Route 206 North Peapack, NJ 07977 / US | [2007/15] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Pharmacia Corporation 700 Chesterfield Parkway West Chesterfield, MO 63017-1732 / US | ||
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Pharmacia Corporation Global Patent Department 575 Maryville Centre Drive 5th Floor, Mail Zone 1006 St. Louis, MO 63141 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Guang, Wei 3172 Birchwood Court Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | 02 /
EWING, Gary, D. 8419 Finch Drive Kalamazoo, MI 49009 / US | 03 /
TYLE, Praveen 8514 Plover Drive Kalamazoo, MI 49009 / US | 04 /
STOLLER, Brenda, M. 6208 Independence Drive Portage, MI 49024 / US | 05 /
GOKHALE, Rajeev 1817 Waxwing Lane Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | 06 /
GADRE, Ashwini 12943 Banyan Town Drive St-Louis, MO 63146 / US | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Dekker, Henrike Cornelie Christine, et al Pfizer European Pharma Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Dekker, Henrike Cornelie Christine, et al Pfizer European Pharma Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | ||
Former [2004/45] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/15] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02774123.0 | 30.05.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002US17067 | Priority number, date | US20010294838P | 31.05.2001 Original published format: US 294838 P | US20010350756P | 13.11.2001 Original published format: US 350756 P | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02096435 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1404345 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/635, A61K31/415, A61K31/42, A61K31/365, A61K31/444, A61K31/4418, A61K31/122, A61K31/352, A61K31/50, A61K47/10, A61P29/00 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/635 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/4418 (EP,US);
A61K31/444 (EP,US);
A61K31/465 (EP,US);
A61K31/50 (EP,US);
A61K31/74 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | 29.12.2003 | LT | 29.12.2003 | LV | 29.12.2003 | MK | 29.12.2003 | RO | 29.12.2003 | SI | 29.12.2003 | Title | German: | HAUTPERMEABLE SELEKTIVE CYCLOOXYGENASE-2 INHIBITOR-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2004/15] | English: | SKIN-PERMEABLE SELECTIVE CYCLOOXYGENASE-2 INHIBITOR COMPOSITION | [2004/15] | French: | COMPOSITION D'INHIBITEUR SELECTIF DE CYCLOOXYGENASE-2, PERMEABLE A LA PEAU | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 11.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/22] | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/22] | Request for further processing for: | 13.03.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.03.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0863134 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA]) [X] 1-14,23-37,46-52 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 10 * * page 5, line 3 - line 14 *; | [X]WO0009117 (EDKO TRADING REPRESENTATION [TR], et al) [X] 1,2,8-16,23-25,31-39,72-77,87-90 * page 2, line 5 - line 11 * * page 2, line 24 - line 33 * * page 3, line 19 - line 24 * * examples 1-6 *; | [A]WO0041538 (NOVEN PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-60,72-80,87-92 * page 18, line 5 - page 20, line 8 *; | [X]WO0050007 (LIPOCINE INC [US]) [X] 1-60,72-80,87-92 * page 4, line 15 - line 22 * * page 7, line 20 - page 29, line 31 * * tables 20,21,26 * * claims 44-47,51,53,54,81-90,114-117,120-126 *; | [X]WO0072883 (AVIANA BIOPHARM [US]) [X] 1-60,72-80,87-92 * page 3, line 32 - line 33 * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 21 - line 30 * * page 6, line 2 - line 5 * * page 9, line 9 - line 23 * * claims 1,3,6,9 *; | [PX]WO0152897 (PANACEA BIOTEC LTD [IN], et al) [PX] 1-60,72-80,87-92 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * examples *; | [PX]WO0217923 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN], et al) [PX] 1-60,72-80,87-92 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 14 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 4 * * page 9, line 12 - line 15 * * tables 1,3,5,7 * * claims 1-4,14,15 *; | [E]WO02056878 (PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-60,72-80,87-92 * page 14, line 2 - line 11 * * page 24, line 8 - line 10 * * page 29, line 13 - line 24 ** tables 2,3,5,7,8 * |