EP1427840 - ENZYMATIC METHOD FOR THE ENANTIOMERIC RESOLUTION OF AMINO ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [2004/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALAGNAD, Christophe 3, passage de l'absolu F-94490 Ormesson sur Marne / FR | 02 /
GOBERT, Claude 12, rue Gustave Charpentier F-94240 L'Hay les Roses / FR | 03 /
DURY, Marie-Odile 2, bis rue des Maraichers F-94480 Ablon / FR | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Bouvet, Philippe Aventis Pharma S.A. Direction des Brevets Tri LEO/144 20 Avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Bouvet, Philippe Aventis Pharma S.A. Direction des Brevets Tri LEO/144 20 Avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/25] | Bouvet, Philippe Aventis Pharma S.A. Direction des Brevets, Tri LEO/144 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02774892.0 | 30.08.2002 | [2004/25] | WO2002FR02976 | Priority number, date | FR20010011431 | 04.09.2001 Original published format: FR 0111431 | US20010331613P | 20.11.2001 Original published format: US 331613 P | [2004/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03020943 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1427840 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1427840 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12P13/04, C12P41/00, C12N9/80 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
C12P41/007 (EP,US);
C12P41/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/25] | Extension states | AL | 12.08.2004 | LT | 12.08.2004 | LV | 12.08.2004 | MK | 12.08.2004 | RO | 12.08.2004 | SI | 12.08.2004 | Title | German: | ENZYMATISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR ENANTIOMEREN TRENNUNG VON AMINOSÄUREN | [2004/25] | English: | ENZYMATIC METHOD FOR THE ENANTIOMERIC RESOLUTION OF AMINO ACIDS | [2004/25] | French: | PROCEDE ENZYMATIQUE POUR LA RESOLUTION ENANTIOMERIQUE D'ACIDES AMINES | [2004/25] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 24.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Request for further processing for: | 19.07.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 19.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 04.10.2006 | TR | 04.10.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 04.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9850575 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [DA] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A] - SHIBUYA Y ET AL, "ISOLATION AND PROPERTIES OF 7-BETA-(4 CARBOXYBUTANAMIDO) CEPHALOSPORANIC-ACID ACYLASE-PRODUCING BACTERIA", AGRICULTURAL AND BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1981), vol. 45, no. 7, ISSN 0002-1369, pages 1561 - 1567, XP002198650 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [DA] - SOLOSHONOK V A ET AL, "Biocatalytic Approach to Enantiomerically Pure beta-Amino Acids", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950701), vol. 6, no. 7, ISSN 0957-4166, pages 1601 - 1610, XP004048135 [DA] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0957-4166(95)00204-3 | [T] - RAIMONDI S ET AL, "Kinetic resolutions of racemic amines and alcohols catalyzed by an industrial glutaryl-7-aminocephalosporanic acid acylase with unexpected broad substrate specificity", TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, (20030502), vol. 14, no. 9, ISSN 0957-4166, pages 1091 - 1094, XP004420949 [T] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0957-4166(03)00171-X |