EP1446856 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MONITORING ELECTRICAL APPLIANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indesit Company S.p.A. Viale Aristide Merloni, 47 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states WRAP S.p.A. Viale Aristide Merloni 47 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALCIONI, Paolo Vicolo Serafini, 10 I-60044 Fabriano / IT | 02 /
MELONI, Francesca Viale Zonghi, 17/B I-60044 Fabriano / IT | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02775157.7 | 19.11.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002IB04851 | Priority number, date | IT2001AN00050 | 23.11.2001 Original published format: IT AN20010050 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03044923 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1446856 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446856 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
H02J13/00004 (EP,US);
H02J13/00002 (EP,US);
H02J13/00028 (EP,US);
G01R31/2825 (EP);
H02J2310/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER ELEKTRISCHEN GERÄTE | [2004/34] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MONITORING ELECTRICAL APPLIANCES | [2004/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE D'APPAREILS ELECTRIQUES | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 23.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2010 | BE | 28.04.2010 | CY | 28.04.2010 | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | NL | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | IE | 19.11.2010 | LU | 19.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 19.11.2010 | ||
LU | 19.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 19.11.2010 | ||
LU | 19.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 19.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
IE | 19.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
CY | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 28.04.2010 | |
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 28.04.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9943068 (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,24,25* the whole document *; | [X]WO0004427 (UNITED TECHNOLOGY PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 26 * abstract * * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 4 *; | [A]WO0115300 (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,18,24,25 * the whole document *; | [PXA]WO0231944 (TRONICS PTY LTD E [ZA], et al) [PX] 26 * abstract * * page 12, paragraph 4 - page 13 * * pages 1-5 * [A] 1,4,7,12,13,17,21,23,25; | [PA]WO0241585 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [PA] 1,24,25 * abstract * * page 2, line 18 - page 5, line 10 *; | [PA]US2002095269 (NATALINI FRANCESCO [IT], et al) [PA] 1,4,5,12,14,15,18,19,22 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 10 - page 6 *; | [PA]WO02056441 (COMBITECH SYSTEMS AB [SE], et al) [PA] 1,4,5,22-25 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - page 7 *; | [XA] - SIMON M ET AL, "Modelling of the life cycle of products with data acquisition features", COMPUTERS IN INDUSTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (200106), vol. 45, no. 2, ISSN 0166-3615, pages 111 - 122, XP004245264 [X] 26 * page 113 - page 116 * [A] 1,2,12-14,16,21,22,24,25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-3615(01)00088-4 | [XA] - SIMON M ET AL, "Life cycle data acquisition unit-design, implementation, economics and environmental benefits", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2000 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ELECTRONICS AND THE ENVIRONMENT (CAT. NO.00CH37082), PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2000 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ELECTRONICS AND THE ENVIRONMENT. ISEE - 2000, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, 8-10 MAY 2000, 2000, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-5962-3, pages 284 - 289, XP002241469 [X] 26 * the whole document * [A] 1,5,14,15,21,24,25 |