EP1441084 - FIXING/ADJUSTING TOOL OF PLATE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONISHI CO., LTD. 6-10, Dosho-machi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2010/29] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Konishi Co., Ltd. 6-10, Dosho-machi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukura, Masaomi Konishi Co., Ltd. 6-10, Dosho-machi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | 02 /
Okamoto, Shinichi Osaka Laboratory Konishi Co. Ltd 7-9, Tsurumi 4-chome Tsurumi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 538-0053 / JP | 03 /
Hamanishi, Yoichi Konishi Co., Ltd. 6-10, Dosho-machi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02775276.5 | 01.10.2002 | [2004/31] | WO2002JP10222 | Priority number, date | JP20010308163 | 04.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001308163 | [2004/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03031749 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1441084 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441084 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
F16B11/006 (EP,US);
E04F13/08 (KR);
E04F13/0885 (EP,US);
F16B5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/31] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGS-/EINSTELLWERKZEUG FÜR PLATTENMATERIAL | [2004/31] | English: | FIXING/ADJUSTING TOOL OF PLATE MATERIAL | [2004/31] | French: | OUTIL DE FIXATION / AJUSTEMENT POUR MATERIAU EN PLAQUES | [2004/31] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2004 | Translation filed | 05.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.07.2010 | BE | 21.07.2010 | CY | 21.07.2010 | CZ | 21.07.2010 | DK | 21.07.2010 | EE | 21.07.2010 | FI | 21.07.2010 | IT | 21.07.2010 | NL | 21.07.2010 | SE | 21.07.2010 | SK | 21.07.2010 | TR | 21.07.2010 | IE | 01.10.2010 | LU | 01.10.2010 | BG | 21.10.2010 | GR | 22.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | ES | 01.11.2010 | PT | 22.11.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 01.10.2010 | ||
LU | 01.10.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 01.10.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
IT | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
ES | 01.11.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SE | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
NL | 21.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH02256762 (INOUE MTP KK); | [A]JPH06173414 (JAPAN COMMUN SCI KK); | [A]JPH07292932 (SANO HEIJI); | [A]JPH07300972 (SOGO KIKAKU KENSETSU KK, et al) | by applicant | JPH06173414 |