EP1455685 - STENT GEOMETRY FOR IMPROVED FLEXIBILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited An Irish company, The Corporate Center, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, West Indies / BB | [2010/19] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited an Irish company, The Corporate Center, Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael, Barbados, West Indies / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERBERDING, Brent, C. 908 Lois Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2004/47] |
Former [2004/38] | 01 /
GERBERDING, Brent, C. 2524 Central Avenue Alameda, CA 94501 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Vossius & Partner P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/15] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/38] | Graalfs, Edo, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02776057.8 | 27.09.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002US31126 | Priority number, date | US20010026413 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: US 26413 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03057076 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1455685 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455685 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91508 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91541 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91558 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2010/19] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STENTGEOMETRIE MIT VERBESSERTER FLEXIBILITÄT | [2004/38] | English: | STENT GEOMETRY FOR IMPROVED FLEXIBILITY | [2004/38] | French: | G OM TRIE D'ENDOPROTH SE FLEXIBILIT AM LIOR E | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.05.2010 | BE | 12.05.2010 | CY | 12.05.2010 | CZ | 12.05.2010 | DK | 12.05.2010 | EE | 12.05.2010 | FI | 12.05.2010 | NL | 12.05.2010 | SE | 12.05.2010 | SK | 12.05.2010 | TR | 12.05.2010 | BG | 12.08.2010 | GR | 13.08.2010 | ES | 23.08.2010 | PT | 13.09.2010 | LU | 27.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
TR | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
LU | 27.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
LU | 27.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CY | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 12.05.2010 | |
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 12.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9918888 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 24 * figure 1 * * page 3, line 7 - page 5, line 28 *[A] 1,12; | [XA]WO9944543 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,24 * figures 12,17-22 * * page 6, line 3 - page 11, line 29 * [A] 12; | [XA]EP1132060 (LPL SYSTEMS INC [CA]) [X] 24 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0040] * [A] 1,12; | [PX]WO02054986 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [PX] 1-4,12-18,24 * figure 1 * * page 6, line 12 - page 8, line 14 * |