EP1455705 - METHOD FOR MAKING AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH ELASTIC CUFF AREAS AND EXPANDABLE SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROESSLER, Thomas, Harold 3023 East Fallcreek Lane Appleton, Wisconsin 54913 / US | 02 /
MORMAN, Michael, Tod 555 Kings Peak Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | 03 /
VAN GOMPEL, Paul, Theodore W9029 School Road Hortonville, WI 54944 / US | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/38] | 01 /
ROESSLER, Thomas, Harold 1034 Greendale Court Menasha, WI 54952 / US | ||
02 /
MORMAN, Michael, Tod 555 Kings Peak Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | |||
03 /
VAN GOMPEL, Paul, Theodore W9029 School Road Hortonville, WI 54944 / US | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02776293.9 | 25.10.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002US34182 | Priority number, date | US20010024988 | 19.12.2001 Original published format: US 24988 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03053307 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1455705 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
A61F13/49011 (EP,US);
A61F13/64 (KR);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/15593 (EP,US);
A61F13/4902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2004/41] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ABSORBIERENDEN ARTIKELS MIT ELASTISCHEN BÜNDCHEN UND DEHNBAREM SUBSTRAT | [2004/38] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH ELASTIC CUFF AREAS AND EXPANDABLE SUBSTRATES | [2004/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE ABSORBANT COMPRENANT DES ZONES ELASTIQUES ET DES SUBSTRATS EXTENSIBLES | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 02.06.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0417766 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-9,11,15,17-20,22,28-30 * figures 2-5; claim 1 * * column 4, line 1 - line 10 * * column 4, line 19 - line 20 * * column 4, line 26 * * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 28 * [Y] 2,12,16,21; | [X]US4397704 (FRICK RICHARD H) [X] 1,3,5,9-12,15,16,18,20,21,23,25,28,30 * figures 7-9; claim 11 * * column 1, line 55 - line 56 * * column 1, line 64 - line 65 * * column 5, line 49 - line 52 * * column 5, line 57 - line 62 *; | [X]EP0820747 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,3-9,11,15,20,28-30 * figures 2,4,5; claims 1,7,12 * * column 14, line 36 - line 39 * * column 19, line 15 - line 22 * * column 19, line 30 - line 32 *; | [X]US4618384 (SABEE REINHARDT N [US]) [X] 1,3,9,12,15,16,18-21 * figure 24; claims 1,4 *; | [X]EP0750893 (HYGA PRODUKTION GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,12,15,16,19-21,23,24,26-29 * figure 1; claim 1 * * column 5, line 18 - line 21 * * column 5, line 34 - line 36 *; | [PX]EP1179330 (ZUIKO CORP [JP]) [PX] 1,2,15,17,20,22 * column 3, line 22 - line 23; claim 1 *; | [PX]EP1228741 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [PX] 1,3,5,9-11,15,17,18,20,22,28,30 * figure 3; claims 5,8 * * column 6, line 49 * * column 7, line 35 - line 36 *; | [DXY]US4968313 (SABEE REINHARDT N [US]) [DX] 28-30 * figures 1-30 * * figures 1-30; claims 2,7,24 * * column 2, lines 36,63 * * column 5, line 39 * * column 12, line 50 - column 13, line 12 * [Y] 2,12,16,21; | [Y]US5700255 (CURRO JOHN JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 2,12,16 * column 2, line 25 - line 27; figure 1 * * column 6, line 49 - line 53 * * column 6, line 61 - line 63 * * column 10, line 58 - line 61 *; | [A]US5407507 (BALL WALTER K [US]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0650714 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]US5167897 (WEBER GERALD M [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]US4938821 (SODERLUND J DONALD [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document * |