|
16.06.2010 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Refund of fees (PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.07.2003 |
international preliminary examination report - Automated negative |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.12.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
05.12.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.12.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
16 |