19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
29.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
18.06.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] |
23.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
16.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
19.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
05.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
22.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
10.07.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
11.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2009 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] |
27.03.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.03.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.12.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.12.2008 |
Change - German title |
published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] |
28.11.2008 |
Change - German title |
published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
24.10.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.06.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.11.2007 |
First examination report |
|
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
03.08.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
25.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.03.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.02.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
06.02.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] |
21.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|