EP1399417 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PERFLUOROALKANESULFONIC ACID ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2009/33] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGNATYEV, Nikolai Prinzenstr. 104 47058 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Michael Weinbergstrasse 41 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 03 /
HEIDER, Udo 4 Wentworth Grange Winchester SO22 4HZ / GB | 04 /
SARTORI, Peter Zur Ludwigshöhe 28 86919 Utting / DE | 05 /
KUCHERYNA, Andry Wörthstrasse 6 47053 Duisburg / DE | [2004/13] | Application number, filing date | 02776502.3 | 04.05.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002EP04917 | Priority number, date | DE2001126929 | 01.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10126929 | DE2001136121 | 26.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10136121 | [2004/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02098844 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1399417 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399417 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C303/26, C07C309/65, C07D295/02, H01M6/16, H01M10/40 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
C07C303/26 (EP,US);
C07C309/65 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D295/023 (EP,US);
C07D295/037 (EP,US);
C07F9/5407 (EP,US);
C07F9/65688 (EP,US);
H01G11/56 (EP,US);
H01G11/62 (EP,US);
H01G9/022 (US);
| C-Set: |
C07C303/26, C07C309/65 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PERFLUORALKANSULFONSÄUREESTERN | [2009/04] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PERFLUOROALKANESULFONIC ACID ESTERS | [2004/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ESTERS D'ACIDE PERFLUOROALCANE SULFONIQUES | [2009/04] |
Former [2004/13] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG PERFLUORALKANSULFONSÄURERESTEN | ||
Former [2004/13] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ESTERS D'ACIDE PERFLUOROALCANE SULFONIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 19.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09006446.0 / EP2085378 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.08.2009 | DK | 12.08.2009 | FI | 12.08.2009 | IE | 12.08.2009 | NL | 12.08.2009 | SE | 12.08.2009 | TR | 12.08.2009 | GR | 13.11.2009 | ES | 23.11.2009 | PT | 12.12.2009 | AT | 04.05.2010 | LU | 04.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 12.08.2009 | |
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
AT | 04.05.2010 | ||
LU | 04.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 12.08.2009 | |
DK | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
AT | 04.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | DK | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
AT | 04.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | DK | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | FI | 12.08.2009 | |
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 12.08.2009 | |
NL | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 12.08.2009 | |
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
ES | 23.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | SE | 12.08.2009 | |
ES | 23.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04233210 ; | [A]WO9014676 (SPECIALISED CONDUCTIVES PTY LT [AU]) [A] 6-15 * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 15; claims 1,5 *; | [A]WO0115258 (UNIV MONASH [AU], et al) [A] 6-15 * the whole document *; | [DA] - T. GRAMSTAD, ET AL., "Perfluoroalkyl derivatives of sulphur. Part IV. Perfluoroalkanesulphonic acids", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Royal Society of Chemistry, Letchworth, GB, (1956), no. 1, pages 173 - 180, XP002211121 [DA] 1 * page 180, line 19 - line 23 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/jr9560000173 | [A] - T.M. SU, ET AL., "The solvolysis of highly unreactive substrates using the trifluoromethanesulphonate leaving group", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (19690910), vol. 91, no. 19, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 5386 - 5388, XP002211122 [A] 1 * page 5386, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01047a035 | [A] - D.C.R. HOCKLESS, ET AL., "1-Methyl-phenylphosphirinium triflate: synthesis, structure and reactivity", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, Royal Society of Chemistry, Letchworth, GB, (19950121), no. 2, ISSN 0022-4936, pages 257 - 258, XP002211152 [A] 3 * page 257, column R, line 13 - line 30 * | [AX] - D. YANG, ET AL., "Design of efficient ketone catalysts for epoxidation by using the field effect", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (19981029), vol. 63, no. 24, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 8952 - 8956, XP002211153 [A] 3 * Schema 3 * [X] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo981270r | [AX] - J.F. KING, ET AL., "Betylates. 3. Preparative nucleophilic substitution by way of [2]-, [3]-, and [4]betylates. Stoichiometric phase transfer and substrate-reagent ion-pair (SRIP) reactions of beylates", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (19821215), vol. 104, no. 25, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 7102 - 7122, XP002211154 [A] 3 * Schema II * [X] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00389a038 | [AX] - S.E. DENMARK, ET AL., "Catalytic epoxidation of alkenes with oxone", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (19950310), vol. 60, no. 5, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 1391 - 1407, XP000917828 [A] 3 * Verbindungen 8+OTf-, 13+OTf-, 14+OTf-;; table 5 * [X] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00110a049 | [AX] - U. CHIACCHIO, ET AL., "A general synthetic approach to 5-alkyl-2(5H)furanones via 1,3-dipolar cycloaddition", TETRAHEDRON, Elsevier Science Publishers, Amsterdam, NL, (19980521), vol. 54, no. 21, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 5695 - 5708, XP004118419 [A] 3 * Verbindung 15 * [X] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(98)00258-0 | [X] - S.E. DENMARK, ET AL., "Dioxiranes are the active agents in ketone-catalyzed epoxidations with oxone", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (19971226), vol. 62, no. 26, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 8964 - 8965, XP002211104 [X] 6 * page 8964, column R, line 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo971500m | [X] - L. ERNST, ET AL., "Darstellung und Kristallstrukturen einiger mit N,N'-Dimethylharnstoff verbrückter Diphosphorverbindungen; NMR-Untersuchung einer gamma4P+gamma4P+-Diphosphor- verbindung", CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, Verlag Chemie, Weinheim, DE, (199001), vol. 123, no. 1, ISSN 0009-2940, pages 35 - 43, XP002211155 [X] 6 * Verbindung 3c * | [A] - D.R. MACFARLANE, ET AL., "Pyrrolidinium imides: a new family of molten salts and conductive plastic crytal phases", JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY B, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US, (19990520), vol. 103, no. 20, ISSN 1520-6106, pages 4164 - 4170, XP002211103 [A] 6-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp984145s | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921222), vol. 016, no. 582, Database accession no. (E - 1300), & JP04233210 A 19920821 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) [A] 6-15 * abstract * |