EP1467888 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE TRAVELLING SPEED OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/18] |
Former [2004/43] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSTOSCH, Mario Auf Hart 75/1 71706 Markgroeningen / DE | [2004/43] | Application number, filing date | 02776692.2 | 07.10.2002 | [2004/43] | WO2002DE03539 | Priority number, date | DE2002101160 | 15.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10201160 | [2004/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03059677 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1467888 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1467888 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60K31/04 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
B60K31/04 (EP,US);
B60W30/146 (EP);
B60W30/18145 (EP);
B60W2720/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/18] |
Former [2004/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER FAHRGESCHWINDIGKEIT EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2004/43] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE TRAVELLING SPEED OF A VEHICLE | [2004/43] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR COMMANDER LA VITESSE DE DEPLACEMENT D'UN VEHICULE | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 21.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19509492 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]DE19821803 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]DE19509494 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1 * figure .; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19654769 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figures 4,5 * | by applicant | EP0507072 | US5351776 | DE10048015 | DE19616732 | US6208926 |