EP1446523 - METHOD FOR SEPARATING A TEXTILE PRODUCT CONSISTING OF AT LEAST TWO CONSTITUENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THÜRINGISCHES INSTITUT FÜR TEXTIL- UND KUNSTSTOFF-FORSCHUNG e.V. Breitscheidstrasse 97 07407 Rudolstadt / DE | For all designated states Textilausrüstung Pfand Gmbh Waldmühlenweg 12 08485 Lengenfeld / DE | [2008/04] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states THÜRINGISCHES INSTITUT FÜR TEXTIL- UND KUNSTSTOFF-FORSCHUNG E.V. Breitscheidstrasse 97 07407 Rudolstadt / DE | ||
For all designated states Textilausrüstung Pfand Gmbh Waldmühlenweg 12 08485 Lengenfeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSAN, Birgit Gustav-Lilienthal-Str. 9 07407 Rudolstadt / DE | 02 /
MICHELS, Christoph Gabelsbergerstr. 7 07407 Rudolstadt / DE | 03 /
PFAND, Frieder Walkmühlenweg 12 08485 Lengenfeld / DE | 04 /
PFAND, Kristiane Walkmühlenweg 12 08485 Lengenfeld / DE | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | Fritz & Brandenburg Patentanwälte Malteserstraße 10a 50859 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Fritz & Brandenburg Patentanwälte Postfach 45 04 20 50879 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Fritz & Brandenburg Patentanwälte Im Mediapark 4d Postfach 19 04 80 50501 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2004/34] | Brandenburg, Thomas, Dr. Brandenburg, Dunkelberg & Franke Lindenstrasse 1 53773 Hennef / DE | Application number, filing date | 02776799.5 | 10.10.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002DE03823 | Priority number, date | DE20011051821 | 20.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10151821 | [2004/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03035963 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1446523 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446523 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D06Q1/02 | [2004/34] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 09.03.2004 | LV | 09.03.2004 | MK | 09.03.2004 | RO | 09.03.2004 | SI | 09.03.2004 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TRENNEN EINES AUS ZWEI ODER MEHEREN KOMPONENTEN BESTEHENDEN TEXTILGUTES | [2004/34] | English: | METHOD FOR SEPARATING A TEXTILE PRODUCT CONSISTING OF AT LEAST TWO CONSTITUENTS | [2004/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE SEPARATION D'UN PRODUIT TEXTILE COMPOSE D'AU MOINS DEUX COMPOSANTES | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 30.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | EE | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | GB | 23.01.2008 | IE | 23.01.2008 | NL | 23.01.2008 | SK | 23.01.2008 | BG | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | ES | 04.05.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | CZ | 10.10.2008 | LU | 10.10.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/32] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
GB | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2008 | ||
LU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
GB | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
GB | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
GB | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
GB | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 04.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1121758 ; | [A]JPS61152888 ; | [A]KR930007831B ; | [A]US2466066 (ERNST WEISS) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS61152888 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0290027 (PLAUENER SPITZE VEB [DE]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5794555 (KWANG RICKY PANG KIM [SG]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH1121758 (NICHIBI KK) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1010794 (TOKAI IND SEWING MACHINE [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11021758 A 19990126 (NICHIBI:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 34, Database accession no. 1986-222132, XP002256198 & JPS61152888 A 19860711 (TORAY IND INC) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 32, Database accession no. 1994-261138, XP002256199 & KR930007831B B1 19930820 (SUNKYONG IND KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |