EP1459488 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR A BI-DIRECTIONAL HALF-DUPLEX TRANSMISSION OF DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/04] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNGER, Andreas Auf der Ay 3/1 72770 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
MORITZ, Rainer Talstrasse 22/1 70794 Filderstadt / DE | 03 /
LUEDERS, Uwe Carl-Zuckmayer-Weg 11 72770 Reutligen / DE | 04 /
ELBRACHT, Berthold Im Salzmann 6/1 72768 Reutlingen / DE | 05 /
HAENSEL, Jens Elsterweg 6 71229 Leonberg / DE | 06 /
KOSTORZ, Wolfgang Blumenstrasse 18 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2008/04] |
Former [2004/43] | 01 /
JUNGER, Andreas Auf der Ay 3/1 72770 Reutlingen / DE | ||
02 /
MORITZ, Rainer Talstrasse 21/ 1 70794 Filderstadt / DE | |||
03 /
LUEDERS, Uwe Carl-Zuckmayer-Weg 11 72770 Reutligen / DE | |||
04 /
ELBRACHT, Berthold Im Salzmann 6/1 72768 Reutlingen / DE | |||
05 /
HAENSEL, Jens Elsterweg 6 71229 Leonberg / DE | |||
06 /
KOSTORZ, Wolfgang Blumenstrasse 18 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | |||
Former [2004/39] | 01 /
JUNGER, Andreas Auf der Ay 3/1 72770 Reutlingen / DE | ||
02 /
MORITZ, Rainer Filderbahnstrasse 50 70794 Filderstadt / DE | |||
03 /
LUEDERS, Uwe Carl-Zuckmayer-Weg 11 72770 Reutligen / DE | |||
04 /
ELBRACHT, Berthold Im Salzmann 6/1 72768 Reutlingen / DE | |||
05 /
HAENSEL, Jens Elsterweg 6 71229 Leonberg / DE | |||
06 /
KOSTORZ, Wolfgang Blumenstrasse 18 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02776847.2 | 23.10.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002DE03990 | Priority number, date | DE2001161656 | 14.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10161656 | [2004/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03053018 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1459488 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1459488 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04L25/49 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
H04L25/0282 (EP,US);
H04L25/0294 (EP,US);
H04L25/4904 (EP,US);
H04L5/16 (EP,US);
H04L25/0272 (EP,US);
H04L25/029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/04] |
Former [2004/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BIDIREKTIONALEN SIMPLEX-ÜBERTRAGUNG VON DATEN | [2004/39] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR A BI-DIRECTIONAL HALF-DUPLEX TRANSMISSION OF DATA | [2004/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION BIDIRECTIONNELLE DE DONNEES A L'ALTERNAT | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 13.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.05.2008 | [2008/35] | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19946776 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-11 * column 1, line 31 - line 55 * * column 5, line 7 - line 10 *; | [A]US3366880 (DRIVER JOEL P) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 71 - column 4, line 7 *; | [A]US5892893 (HANF PETER [DE], et al) [A] 8 * abstract * * column 7, line 9 - line 12 *; | [A]DE19813964 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE], et al) [A] 11 * column 4, line 30 - line 35 *; | [A]US6094696 (CHOE GWANGWOO [US], et al) [A] 2,5 * column 9, line 6 - line 28 *; | [A]US5764727 (TOUMANI ROUBEN [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 8, line 16 - line 17 * * column 10, line 26 - line 30 * * column 10, line 60 - line 61 * |