EP1444059 - CONTROL METHOD FOR A PRODUCTION LINE FOR ROLLING HOT-ROLLED METAL STRIPS DISPOSED UPSTREAM OF A COOLING STRETCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Revocation of patent | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies Germany GmbH Schuhstrasse 60 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2015/39] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINZIERL, Klaus Eisensteiner Str. 12 30 90480 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
METZGER, Michael Würzburger Ring 33 91056 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
KURZ, Matthias Beim Drudenbaum 29 91056 Erlangen / DE | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Metals@Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 02776880.3 | 07.11.2002 | [2004/33] | WO2002DE04125 | Priority number, date | DE20011056008 | 15.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10156008 | [2004/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03045599 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1444059 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1444059 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B21B37/74, C21D11/00 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
B21B37/74 (EP,US);
C21D11/005 (EP,US);
C21D9/573 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49764 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49771 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49991 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53526 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FI, FR, IT [2009/35] |
Former [2004/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVERFAHREN FÜR EINE EINER KÜHLSTRECKE VORGEORDNETE FERTIGSTRASSE ZUM WALZEN VON METALL-WARMBAND | [2004/33] | English: | CONTROL METHOD FOR A PRODUCTION LINE FOR ROLLING HOT-ROLLED METAL STRIPS DISPOSED UPSTREAM OF A COOLING STRETCH | [2004/33] | French: | PROCEDE POUR COMMANDER UN TRAIN FINISSEUR MONTE EN AMONT D'UNE SECTION DE REFROIDISSEMENT ET CONCU POUR LAMINER DES FEUILLARDS METALLIQUES A CHAUD | [2004/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 26.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.2010
04.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE SMS group GmbH Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Klüppel, Walter, et al, et al Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstraße 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [2016/50] |
Former [2010/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.05.2010
SMS Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Klüppel, Walter, et al, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich & Kollegen Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | 30.06.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.08.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 10.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.11.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.10.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 03.02.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | 20.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 30.09.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/06] | Appeal following opposition | 29.01.2019 | Appeal received No. T0341/19 | 10.04.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.10.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | 16.11.2022 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2022/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2013 | FI | 07.11.2013 | BE | 30.11.2013 | FR | 02.12.2013 | IT | 07.11.2014 | [2016/03] |
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.11.2013 | |
FI | 07.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 07.11.2013 | |
FI | 07.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 07.11.2013 | |
FI | 07.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63168211 ; | [A]US6220067 (SANO MITSUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1,18,19 * the whole document *; | [DXA]DE19963186 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DX] 18 * the whole document * [A] 1,19; | [XA] - SIXTENSSON P ET AL, "NEW PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES AND AUTOMATION SYSTEMS FOR HOT ROLLING MILLS", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NEW DEVELOPMENTS IN METALLURGICAL PROCESS TECHNOLOGY, DÜSSELDORF, DE, (199906), pages 208 - 217, XP001011835 [X] 18 * the whole document * [A] 1,19 | [A] - ANDORFER J ET AL, "OPERATIONAL EXPERIENCE WITH VAI-Q STRIP: ON-LINE SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING HOT ROLLED STRIP MECHANICAL PROPERTIES", AISE STEEL TECHNOLOGY, AISE, PITTSBURG, PA, US, (200007), vol. 77, no. 7, ISSN 0021-1559, pages 43 - 46, XP000966014 [A] 1,18,19 * the whole document * | [A] - ANDORFER J ET AL, "VAIQ-STRIP, UN NOUVEAU SYSTEME DE CONTROLE DE QUALITE POUR LES BANDES LAMINEES A CHAUD", CAHIERS D'INFORMATIONS TECHNIQUES DE LA REVUE DE METALLURGIE, REVUE DE METALLURGIE. PARIS, FR, (19980701), vol. 95, no. 7/8, ISSN 0035-1563, pages 883 - 892, XP000789911 [A] 1,18,19 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881116), vol. 012, no. 434, Database accession no. (M - 764), & JP63168211 A 19880712 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [A] 1,18,19 * abstract * |