EP1412279 - LABELLING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93068 Neutraubling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states KRONES AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93068 Neutraubling / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDER, Erich Goethe-Strasse 6 93093 Donaustauf / DE | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02777111.2 | 14.09.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002EP10338 | Priority number, date | DE2001145455 | 14.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10145455 | [2004/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03024861 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1412279 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1412279 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B67C7/00 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
B67C7/002 (EP,US);
B65C9/00 (EP,US);
B65C9/0062 (EP,US);
B65C9/02 (EP,US);
B67C7/0046 (EP,US);
F16D3/80 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ETIKETTIERMASCHINE | [2004/18] | English: | LABELLING MACHINE | [2004/18] | French: | MACHINE D'ETIQUETAGE | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2003 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 12.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04012550.2 / EP1449809 | EP05004404.9 / EP1553045 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.2005
22.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE P.E. S.r.l. Via Europa, 25 46047 Porto Mantovano (Mantova) / IT Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.2005
22.07.2005
ADMISSIBLE P.E. S.r.l. Via Europa, 25 46047 Porto Mantovano (Mantova) / IT Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.2005
P.E. S.r.l. Via Europa, 25 46047 Porto Mantovano (Mantova) / IT Opponent's representative Modiano, Guido, et al, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | 21.09.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.02.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.01.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.01.2007 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.05.2007 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/30] | Appeal following opposition | 05.03.2007 | Appeal received No. T0362/07 | 28.05.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 03.11.2004 | EE | 03.11.2004 | FI | 03.11.2004 | IE | 03.11.2004 | TR | 03.11.2004 | GR | 03.02.2005 | PT | 03.04.2005 | CY | 14.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | SK | 14.09.2006 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/46] | BG | 03.11.2004 | |
EE | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
CY | 14.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
SK | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | BG | 03.11.2004 | |
EE | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
CY | 14.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | BG | 03.11.2004 | |
EE | 03.11.2004 | ||
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BG | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
TR | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | BG | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
IE | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 03.11.2004 | |
FI | 03.11.2004 | ||
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 03.11.2004 | |
GR | 03.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 03.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE944922 (SEITZ WERKE GMBH); | [A]US4479343 (TINCATI FRANCO [IT]) [A] 1,22 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3134661 | DE19741476 |