EP1448744 - ADHESIVE TAPE COMPRISING A POLISHED SUPPORT SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states certoplast Vorwerk & Sohn GmbH Müngstener Strasse 10 42285 Wuppertal / DE | [2004/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNDT, Stefan Corellistrasse 97 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Nunnenkamp, Jörg Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Nunnenkamp, Jörg, Dr. Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien Patentanwälte Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02777219.3 | 26.09.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002EP10801 | Priority number, date | DE20011050453 | 16.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10150453 | DE20022005486U | 10.04.2002 Original published format: DE 20205486 U | [2004/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03033611 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1448744 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1448744 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/04 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
C09J7/21 (EP,US);
C09J2203/302 (EP,US);
C09J2400/263 (EP,US);
C09J2421/00 (EP,US);
C09J2433/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 27.03.2004 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBEBAND MIT GLATTGESCHLIFFENER TRÄGEROBERFLÄCHE | [2004/35] | English: | ADHESIVE TAPE COMPRISING A POLISHED SUPPORT SURFACE | [2004/35] | French: | BANDE ADHESIVE A SURFACE SUPPORT LISSEE | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 31.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.12.2005 | EE | 14.12.2005 | FI | 14.12.2005 | IE | 14.12.2005 | TR | 14.12.2005 | BG | 14.03.2006 | DK | 14.03.2006 | GR | 14.03.2006 | SE | 14.03.2006 | PT | 15.05.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/02] | CY | 14.12.2005 | |
EE | 14.12.2005 | ||
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | EE | 14.12.2005 | |
FI | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 14.12.2005 | |
IE | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 14.12.2005 | |
IE | 14.12.2005 | ||
IT | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 14.12.2005 | |
IE | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
DK | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 14.12.2005 | |
IE | 14.12.2005 | ||
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/41] | FI | 14.12.2005 | |
BG | 14.03.2006 | ||
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 14.12.2005 | |
GR | 14.03.2006 | ||
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 14.12.2005 | |
SE | 14.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 14.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE4341532 (DACOR WEBETIKETTEN DAUSEND GMB [DE]) [DA] 1-3* column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 1 *; | [DX]EP0942057 (CERTOPLAST VORWERK & SOHN GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-11 * claim - * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 1 * * column 4, line 9 - line 26 * |