EP1429795 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING EXTRACTS OF PELARGONIUM SIDOIDES AND/OR PELARGONIUM RENIFORME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/26] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING EXTRACTS OF PELARGONIUM SIDOIDES AND/OR PELARGONIUM RENIFORME, AND THE USE OF SAID EXTRACTS | ||
[2007/08] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Willmar Schwabe GmbH & Co. KG Willmar-Schwabe-Strasse 4 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Iso Arzneimittel GmbH & Co. KG Bunsenstrasse 6-10 76275 Ettlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERDELMEIER, Clemens Glogauer Strasse 32 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
HAUER, Hermann Trollingerstrasse 7 76228 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
KOCH, Egon Am Giessbach 11a 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Adam, Holger, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02777223.5 | 26.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002EP10813 | Priority number, date | DE20011047644 | 27.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10147644 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03028746 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1429795 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1429795 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/185 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
A61K36/185 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | A61K35/78, A61P31/00, A61P29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EXTRAKTEN AUS PELARGONIUM SIDOIDES UND/ODER PELARGONIUM RENIFORME | [2007/08] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING EXTRACTS OF PELARGONIUM SIDOIDES AND/OR PELARGONIUM RENIFORME | [2007/08] | French: | PROCEDE D'OBTENTION D'EXTRAITS DE PELARGONIUM SIDOIDES ET/OU PELARGONIUM RENIFORME | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/26] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EXTRAKTEN AUS PELARGONIUM SIDOIDES UND/ODER PELARGONIUM RENIFORME UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2004/26] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING EXTRACTS OF PELARGONIUM SIDOIDES AND/OR PELARGONIUM RENIFORME, AND THE USE OF SAID EXTRACTS | ||
Former [2004/26] | PROCEDE D'OBTENTION D'EXTRAITS DE PELARGONIUM SIDOIDES ET/OU PELARGONIUM RENIFORME, ET UTILISATION DE CES EXTRAITS | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Frutarom Schweiz AG Rütiwisstrasse 8820 Wädenswil / CH Opponent's representative Zink-Wild, Markus Peter Patentanwaltsbüro Zink Birchlistrasse 11 8173 Riedt-Neerach (Zürich) / CH | 02
10.03.2008
04.06.2008
ADMISSIBLE African Centre for Biosafety et al. 12 Clamart Road Richmond 2092 Johannesburg / ZA Opponent's representative Dolder, Fritz, et al, et al Rosenbergstrasse 6 Postfach 558 8304 Wallisellen-Zürich / CH | 03
11.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Alpinamed AG Alte Landstrasse 11 9306 Freidorf / CH Opponent's representative Frei, Alexandra Sarah, et al, et al Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | 04
13.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Finzelberg GmbH & Co. KG Koblenzer Strasse 48-54 56626 Andernach / DE Opponent's representative dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB, et al, et al Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Frutarom Schweiz AG Rütiwisstrasse 8820 Wädenswil / CH Opponent's representative Zink-Wild, Markus Peter Patentanwaltsbüro Zink Birchlistrasse 11 8173 Riedt-Neerach (Zürich) / CH | ||
02
10.03.2008
04.06.2008
ADMISSIBLE African Centre for Biosafety et al. 12 Clamart Road Richmond 2092 Johannesburg / ZA Opponent's representative Dolder, Fritz, et al, et al Rosenbergstrasse 6 Postfach 558 8304 Wallisellen-Zürich / CH | |||
03
11.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Alpinamed AG Alte Landstrasse 11 9306 Freidorf / CH Opponent's representative Frei, Alexandra Sarah, et al, et al Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | |||
04
13.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Finzelberg GmbH & Co. KG Koblenzer Strasse 48-54 56626 Andernach / DE Opponent's representative von Kreisler Selting Werner, et al, et al Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | |||
Former [2009/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Frutarom Schweiz AG Rütiwisstrasse 8820 Wädenswil / CH Opponent's representative Zink-Wild, Markus Peter Patentanwaltsbüro Zink Birchlistrasse 11 8173 Riedt-Neerach (Zürich) / CH | ||
02
10.03.2008
04.06.2008
ADMISSIBLE African Centre for Biosafety et al. 12 Clamart Road Richmond 2092 Johannesburg / ZA Opponent's representative Dolder, Fritz, et al, et al Rosenbergstrasse 6 Postfach 558 8304 Wallisellen-Zürich / CH | |||
03
11.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Alpinamed AG Alte Landstrasse 11 9306 Freidorf / CH Opponent's representative Frei, Alexandra Sarah, et al, et al Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | |||
04
13.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Finzelberg GmbH & Co. KG Koblenzer Strasse 48-54 56626 Andernach / DE Opponent's representative Schreiber, Christoph, et al, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannshaus am Dom, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | |||
Former [2009/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Frutarom Schweiz AG Rütiwisstrasse 8820 Wädenswil / CH Opponent's representative Zink-Wild, Markus Peter Patentanwaltsbüro Zink Birchlistrasse 11 8173 Riedt-Neerach (Zürich) / CH | ||
02
10.03.2008
04.06.2008
ADMISSIBLE African Centre for Biosafety et al. 12 Clamart Road Richmond 2092 Johannesburg / ZA Opponent's representative Dolder, Fritz, et al, et al Rosenbergstrasse 6 Postfach 558 8304 Wallisellen-Zürich / CH | |||
03
11.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Alpinamed AG Alte Landstrasse 11 9306 Freidorf / CH Opponent's representative Frei, Alexandra Sarah, et al, et al Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | |||
04
13.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Finzelberg GmbH & Co. KG Koblenzer Strasse 48-54 56626 Andernach / DE Opponent's representative Schreiber, Christoph, et al, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannshaus am Dom, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | |||
Former [2008/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Frutarom Schweiz AG Rütiwisstrasse 8820 Wädenswil / CH Opponent's representative Zink-Wild, Markus Peter Patentanwaltsbüro Zink, Birchlistrasse 11 8173 Riedt-Neerach (Zürich) / CH | ||
02
10.03.2008
African Centre for Biosafety et al. 12 Clamart Road Richmond 2092 Johannesburg / ZA Opponent's representative Dolder, Fritz, et al, et al Rosenbergstrasse 6 Postfach 558 8304 Wallisellen-Zürich / CH | |||
03
11.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Alpinamed AG Alte Landstrasse 11 9306 Freidorf / CH Opponent's representative Frei, Alexandra Sarah, et al, et al Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | |||
04
13.03.2008
20.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Finzelberg GmbH & Co. KG Koblenzer Strasse 48-54 56626 Andernach / DE Opponent's representative Schreiber, Christoph, et al, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannshaus am Dom, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | |||
Former [2008/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2008
Frutarom Schweiz AG Rütiwisstrasse 8820 Wädenswil / CH Opponent's representative Zink-Wild, Markus Peter Patentanwaltsbüro Zink, Birchlistrasse 11 8173 Riedt-Neerach (Zürich) / CH | ||
02
10.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE African Centre for Biosafety et al. 12 Clamart Road Richmond 2092 Johannesburg / ZA Opponent's representative Dolder, Fritz, et al, et al Rosenbergstrasse 6 Postfach 558 8304 Wallisellen-Zürich / CH | |||
03
11.03.2008
Alpinamed AG Alte Landstrasse 11 9306 Freidorf / CH Opponent's representative Frei, Alexandra Sarah, et al, et al Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | 13.06.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.12.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.01.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.01.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/36] | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | IE | 13.06.2007 | LI | 13.06.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | LU | 26.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2010/48] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 13.06.2007 | |
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
LU | 26.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 13.06.2007 | |
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/15] | EE | 13.06.2007 | |
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | EE | 13.06.2007 | |
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | IE | 13.06.2007 | |
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | IE | 13.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X] - KOLODZIEJ H. ET AL, "PELARGONIUM SIDOIDES DC.", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR PHYTOTHERAPIE, (1998), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 141 - 151, XP008011448 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | [X] - HAIDVOGL M. ET AL, "AKUTE BRONCHITIS IM KINDESALTER.", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR PHYTOTHERAPIE, (199610), vol. 17, no. 5, pages 300 - 313, XP008011447 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * |