EP1436821 - MULTIPLE WAY SWITCH ASSEMBLY AND SWITCH MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG Wiesenstrasse 47 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2006/21] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG Wiesenstrasse 47 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENCHE, Edgar Honseler Str. 38 58511 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2004/29] | Application number, filing date | 02777311.8 | 15.10.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002EP11499 | Priority number, date | DE2001151603 | 18.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10151603 | [2004/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03036674 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436821 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1436821 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H25/04, H01H23/00 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
H01H23/00 (EP,US);
G05G9/047 (EP,US);
H01H11/0006 (EP,US);
H01H25/04 (EP,US);
H01H2237/004 (EP,US);
H01H2300/01 (EP,US);
H01H2300/012 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRWEGE-SCHALTERANORDNUNG, SOWIE SCHALTERBAUSTEIN | [2004/29] | English: | MULTIPLE WAY SWITCH ASSEMBLY AND SWITCH MODULE | [2004/29] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUTATEUR A PLUSIEURS VOIES ET MODULE DE COMMUTATION | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.05.2006 | CZ | 24.05.2006 | EE | 24.05.2006 | FI | 24.05.2006 | IE | 24.05.2006 | NL | 24.05.2006 | SK | 24.05.2006 | TR | 24.05.2006 | BG | 24.08.2006 | DK | 24.08.2006 | SE | 24.08.2006 | GR | 25.08.2006 | AT | 15.10.2006 | LU | 15.10.2006 | PT | 24.10.2006 | BE | 31.10.2006 | CH | 31.10.2006 | LI | 31.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/03] | CY | 24.05.2006 | |
CZ | 24.05.2006 | ||
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
TR | 24.05.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
AT | 15.10.2006 | ||
LU | 15.10.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
CH | 31.10.2006 | ||
LI | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
TR | 24.05.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
AT | 15.10.2006 | ||
LU | 15.10.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
CH | 31.10.2006 | ||
LI | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
BG | 24.08.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
AT | 15.10.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
CH | 31.10.2006 | ||
LI | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
EE | 24.05.2006 | ||
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
AT | 15.10.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
CH | 31.10.2006 | ||
LI | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
AT | 15.10.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
CH | 31.10.2006 | ||
LI | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
AT | 15.10.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
CH | 31.10.2006 | ||
LI | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
CH | 31.10.2006 | ||
LI | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
CH | 31.10.2006 | ||
LI | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CZ | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SK | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 24.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4181827 (DIEPEVEEN JOHN C [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19517538 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP1063664 (CITIZEN ELECTRONICS [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]EP1126483 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * column 9, line 8 - line 56; figure 1 * | Examination | US5719361 |