EP1444208 - SUBSTITUTED PYRIMIDINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GESING, Ernst Rudolf F. Trillser Graben 4 40699 Erkrath / DE | 02 /
DREWES, Mark, Wilhelm Goethestr. 38 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 03 /
DAHMEN, Peter Altebrücker Str. 61 41470 Neuss / DE | 04 /
FEUCHT, Dieter Hölderlinstrasse 9 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 05 /
PONTZEN, Rolf Am Kloster 69 42799 Leichlingen / DE | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Schwenk, Norbert, et al Bayer CropScience AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Industriepark Hoechst, Gebäude K 607 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Schwenk, Norbert, et al Bayer CropScience AG Patents and Licensing Industriepark Hoechst Bullding K 607 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2005/16] | Schwenk, Norbert, Dr., et al Bayer CropScience GmbH Gebäude K 607 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 02777320.9 | 21.10.2002 | [2004/33] | WO2002EP11744 | Priority number, date | DE2001154075 | 02.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10154075 | [2004/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03037878 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1444208 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/78, C07D239/38, C07D417/12, C07D401/12, C07D405/12 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D239/38 (EP,US);
C07D239/78 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE PYRIMIDINE | [2004/33] | English: | SUBSTITUTED PYRIMIDINES | [2004/33] | French: | PYRIMIDINES SUBSTITUEES | [2004/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 23.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 12.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4423047 (BENNECHE TORE [NO], et al) [A] 1,6 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]GB2135992 (NYEGAARD & CO AS) [DA] 1,2* examples 2-7 *; | [DA]GB2205101 (MAY & BAKER LTD) [DA] 1,2,6,7 * example -; claim - *; | JPH0559015 [ ] (OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1993), vol. 119, no. 3, Database accession no. 22820v, page 330, column 1, XP002230397 [A] 1-5,7 * abstract * |