EP1553838 - FLOUR TREATMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ljungström, Marc Agatan 41 374 23 Karlsham / SE | [2005/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Petri, Stellan Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Petri, Stellan Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 02778171.5 | 23.10.2002 | [2005/29] | WO2002SE01924 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004037002 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553838 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553838 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A21D6/00, A21D2/14 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
A21D2/14 (EP,US);
A21D10/007 (EP,US);
A21D10/045 (EP,US);
A21D6/00 (EP,US);
A21D6/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | 14.03.2005 | LT | 14.03.2005 | LV | 14.03.2005 | MK | 14.03.2005 | RO | 14.03.2005 | SI | 14.03.2005 | Title | German: | MEHLBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/29] | English: | FLOUR TREATMENT METHOD | [2005/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DES FARINES | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 15.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 21.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2006 | BE | 02.08.2006 | CH | 02.08.2006 | CY | 02.08.2006 | CZ | 02.08.2006 | EE | 02.08.2006 | LI | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | SK | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | IE | 23.10.2006 | LU | 23.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | BG | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
TR | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.10.2006 | ||
LU | 23.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
LI | 02.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2002222 (CALPIS FOOD IND CO LTD); | [A]EP0105640 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [A]FR2671266 (AGRO INVERTISSEMENT DEV [FR]); | [X]US5384139 (VASSENEIX ANDRE [FR]) |