EP1429998 - POLYMER CLAY NANOCOMPOSITE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/26] | MODIFIED CLAYS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE SAME | ||
[2010/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORAH, Dennis, Paul 1692 Heebner Way Lansdale, PA 19442 / US | 02 /
SLONE, Robert, Victor 535 Highland Avenue Ambler, PA 19002 / US | 03 /
LEIN, George, Max 80 Oxbow Circle Chalfont, PA 18914 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2004/26] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd., European Patent Department, 28th Floor, City Point, One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02778329.9 | 25.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002US30378 | Priority number, date | US20010325296P | 27.09.2001 Original published format: US 325296 P | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03027017 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1429998 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1429998 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/44, B01J39/14, C08K9/04 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
C01B33/44 (EP,KR,US);
C04B30/00 (EP,US);
C08K9/02 (EP,US);
C08K9/04 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/07] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMER-TON NANOVERBUNDZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2010/41] | English: | POLYMER CLAY NANOCOMPOSITE COMPOSITION | [2010/41] | French: | COMPOSITION NANOCOMPOSITE POLYMERE-ARGILE | [2010/41] |
Former [2004/26] | MODIFIZIERTE TONMINERALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2004/26] | MODIFIED CLAYS AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2004/26] | ARGILES MODIFIEES ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION DE CELLES-CI | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 29.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.01.2010 | 14.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0495048 ; | [X]DD111919 (VEB PCK SCHWEDT) [X] 1-11* the whole document *; | [X]US4839173 (PLANTEFEVE JEAN-CLAUDE [FR], et al) [X] 1,4-7,12-16 * claim - *; | [X]GB2297334 (ECC INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,12-16 * example . *; | [X]EP1038834 (AMCOL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,12,15-19 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920717), vol. 016, no. 329, Database accession no. (C - 0963), & JP04095048 A 19920327 (SHISEIDO CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-6,12-17,20,21 * abstract * | by applicant | US5336647 | US5429999 | US5998538 | EP1038834 | - M. OGAWA ET AL., "Preparation of inorganic-organic nanocomposites through intercalation of organoammonium ions into layered silicates", BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1997), vol. 70, pages 2593 - 2619 | - A. 1. ZHUKOVA ET AL., "Ion Exchange Interaction of Quaternary Alkylammmonium Cations with Sodium and Calcium Forms of Montmorillonite", UKR. KHIM. ZH., (1975), vol. 41, no. 7, pages 696 - 699 | - T. G. FOX, BULL. AM. PHYSICS SOC., (1956), vol. 1, no. 3, page 123 |