EP1450977 - TOOL HOLDER ASSEMBLY WITH COOLANT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/36] | TOOL HOLDER WITH COOLANT SYSTEM | ||
[2011/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kraemer, Rolf H. 5683 Obed Heights Drive Edinboro PA 16412 / US | [2011/34] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Kraemer, Rolf H. 5683 Obed Heights Drive Edinboro, PA 16412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Pizzoli, Pasquale Vincenzo, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Via G. Carducci 8 20123 Milano (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Pizzoli, Pasquale Vincenzo, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A, Via G. Carducci 8 20123 Milano (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 02778487.5 | 07.10.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US32246 | Priority number, date | US20010000999 | 01.11.2001 Original published format: US 999 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03037555 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1450977 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1450977 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/22, B23P15/28 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
B23Q11/10 (EP,US);
B23B27/10 (EP,US);
B23B27/1677 (EP,US);
B23Q1/0018 (EP,US);
Y10T407/14 (EP,US);
Y10T407/2268 (EP,US);
Y10T407/2276 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUGHALTERANORDNUNG MIT KÜHLMITTELSYSTEM | [2011/14] | English: | TOOL HOLDER ASSEMBLY WITH COOLANT SYSTEM | [2011/14] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE PORTE-OUTIL AVEC SYSTEME DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2011/14] |
Former [2004/36] | WERKZEUGHALTER FÜR KÜHLMITTELSYSTEM | ||
Former [2004/36] | TOOL HOLDER WITH COOLANT SYSTEM | ||
Former [2004/36] | PORTE-OUTIL AVEC SYSTEME DE REFROIDISSEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.2011 | BE | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | IE | 07.10.2011 | LU | 07.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 07.10.2011 | ||
LU | 07.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 07.10.2011 | ||
LU | 07.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IE | 07.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/32] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 24.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US591623 (SHANE Y. HONG) [X] 1-3,5-13 * column 1, line 7 - line 14 * * figures 4-9 *[A] 15-27; | [XA]US4621547 (YANKOFF GERALD K [US]) [X] 1-3,5-13 * column 1, line 17 - line 20 * * figures 3-5 * [A] 15-27 | International search | [Y]US3842470 (HERTEL K); | [Y]US4714384 (LAGERBERG STIG E V [SE]); | [A]US4934878 (PLUTSCHUCK LAWRENCE [US], et al); | [Y]US4940369 (AEBI GILBERT [CH], et al); | [X]US4955264 (ARMBRUST WILLIAM D [US]); | [X]US5901623 (HONG SHANE Y [US]) |