EP1442538 - MULTIPLE-ACCESS MULTIPLE-INPUT MULTIPLE-OUTPUT (MIMO) COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALTON, Jay, R. QUALCOMM Incorporated, 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
WALLACE, Mark 4 Madel Lane Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 03 /
HOWARD, Steven, J. 75 Heritage Avenue Ashland, MA 01721 / US | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/32] | 01 /
WALTON, Jay, R. 7 Ledgewood Drive Westford, MA 01886 / US | ||
02 /
WALLACE, Mark 4 Madel Lane Bedford, MA 01730 / US | |||
03 /
HOWARD, Steven, J. 75 Heritage Avenue Ashland, MA 01721 / US | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02778726.6 | 05.11.2002 | [2004/32] | WO2002US35364 | Priority number, date | US20010993087 | 06.11.2001 Original published format: US 993087 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03041300 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1442538 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04L1/06 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
H04B7/0417 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0452 (EP,US);
H04B7/0626 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/066 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0689 (EP,US);
H04B7/0891 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIELFACHZUGRIFF MULTIPLE-INPUT MULTIPLE-OUTPUT KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2004/32] | English: | MULTIPLE-ACCESS MULTIPLE-INPUT MULTIPLE-OUTPUT (MIMO) COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2004/32] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION A SORTIES MULTIPLES, A ENTREES MULTIPLES (MIMO) ET A ACCES MULTIPLES | [2004/32] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 03.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/47] | 05.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0176110 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-9,50,52 * abstract * * page 2, lines 8-22 * * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 3 * * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 2 * * page 10, lines 5-20 * * page 13, line 20 - page 15, line 15 * * page 23, line 24 - page 24, line 21 * * claims 1,19 * * figures 1,3,6 *; | [X]WO0171928 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-9,50,52 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 34 * * page 14, lines 1-28 * * figures 1A,1B,3,6 * | by applicant | WO0176110 | WO0171928 |