EP1444433 - FUEL INJECTOR WITH CONTROLLED HIGH PRESSURE FUEL PASSAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Engine Intellectual Property Company, LLC. 4201 Winfield Road, P.O. Box 1488 Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states International Engine Intellectual Property Company, LLC. 4201 Winfield Road, P.O. Box 1488 Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEI, Ning 7 Charleton Place Oakbrook, IL 60523 / US | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Kopp, Stephan Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Kopp, Stephan KUHNEN & WACKER, Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prins-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 02778758.9 | 06.11.2002 | [2004/33] | WO2002US35679 | Priority number, date | US20010002937 | 15.11.2001 Original published format: US 2937 | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03044359 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1444433 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M59/10, F02M57/02, F02M47/02 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
F02M45/04 (EP,US);
F02M47/02 (KR);
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M57/025 (EP,US);
F02M59/466 (EP,US);
F02M63/0007 (EP,US);
F02M63/0225 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL MIT GESTEUERTEM HOCHDRUCKKRAFTSTOFFDURCHGANG | [2004/33] | English: | FUEL INJECTOR WITH CONTROLLED HIGH PRESSURE FUEL PASSAGE | [2004/33] | French: | INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT A PASSAGE DE CARBURANT HAUTE PRESSION REGULE | [2004/33] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 01.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/16] | 22.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0055496 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al); | [Y]US5931139 (MACK DAVID C [US]); | [Y]US6029632 (AUGUSTIN ULRICH [DE]); | [A]US5862792 (PAUL MARIUS A [US], et al); | [A]US5651345 (MILLER CHARLES R [US], et al); | [A]US4624233 (PHILLIPS RONALD [GB]) |