Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7825950 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2010 | B2 | US2005129272 | 16.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE0204012 | 25.10.2002 | DE10158990 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1454285 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2006 | B1 | EP1454285 | 08.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE0204012 | 25.10.2002 | DE10158990 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50208218D1 | 02.11.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE0204012 | 25.10.2002 | DE50208218 | 25.10.2002 | DE10158990 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03049009 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10158990 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10158990 | 10.04.2003 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE10158990 | 30.11.2001 |