EP1454285 - VIDEO MONITORING SYSTEM WITH OBJECT MASKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | 27.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/38] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTTMANN, Frank Sedanstrasse 33 81667 München / DE | [2004/37] | Application number, filing date | 02779177.1 | 25.10.2002 | [2004/37] | WO2002DE04012 | Priority number, date | DE2001158990 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158990 | [2004/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03049009 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1454285 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1454285 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G08B13/196 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G08B13/19686 (EP,US);
G06V40/161 (EP,US);
G08B13/19643 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2006/38] |
Former [2004/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VIDEOÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM MIT OBJEKTMASKIERUNG | [2004/37] | English: | VIDEO MONITORING SYSTEM WITH OBJECT MASKING | [2004/37] | French: | SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE VIDEO AVEC MASQUAGE D'OBJETS | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 17.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.09.2006 | ES | 31.12.2006 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/21] | ES | 31.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP1107166 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0010] , [0023] , [0024] , [0079]; figure 9 * [A] 5; | [YA]EP1081955 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] - [0013] - [0015] , [0032] , [0047] , [0057] , [0058] , [0069] , [0072] , [0073] , [0075]; figure 5 * [A] 5; | [A]DE10001252 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 32 - line 51 * * column 4, line 24 - line 47 *; | [E]WO03010728 (KONINKL KPN NV [NL], et al) [E] 1 * the whole document * | [Y] - HASEGAWA O ET AL, "Real-time parallel and cooperative recognition of facial images for an interactive visual human interface", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IAPR INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION. JERUSALEM, OCT. 9 - 13, 1994. CONFERENCE C: SIGNAL PROCESSING / CONFERENCE D: PARALLEL COMPUTING, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, XP010216422 [Y] 6 * section 3.1.1 * |