07.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
22.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
04.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] |
21.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
29.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
15.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] |
21.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
22.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
01.01.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] |
13.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
06.11.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
30.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
16.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |
09.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
14.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] |
17.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
23.01.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
02.12.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.12.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.09.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.11.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.06.2006 |
First examination report |
|
15.06.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.03.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.02.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.09.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
10.09.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
03.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.06.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
18.06.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|