EP1470025 - ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE TO BE MOUNTED ON A RETAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/09] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEELHAAR, Bernd Louise-Wippern-Strasse 21 31137 Hildesheim / DE | 02 /
KNOCHENHAUER, Peter In Der Schratwanne 31 31141 Hildesheim / DE | [2004/44] | Application number, filing date | 02779188.8 | 30.10.2002 | [2004/44] | WO2002DE04040 | Priority number, date | DE2002102034 | 18.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10202034 | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03059693 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1470025 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1470025 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/00 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
B60R11/00 (EP,US);
B60R11/0229 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0028 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0071 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT ZUM ANBRINGEN AN EINER HALTERUNG UND HALTERUNG HIERFüR | [2004/44] | English: | ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE TO BE MOUNTED ON A RETAINER | [2004/44] | French: | APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE DESTINE A ETRE ATTACHE A UN SUPPORT ET SUPPORT ASSOCIE | [2004/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.02.2009 | CZ | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | EE | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IE | 25.02.2009 | IT | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | SK | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | BG | 25.05.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | AT | 30.10.2009 | LU | 30.10.2009 | BE | 31.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
AT | 30.10.2009 | ||
LU | 30.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
AT | 30.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
AT | 30.10.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
BE | 31.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | CZ | 25.02.2009 | |
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | DK | 25.02.2009 | |
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | FI | 25.02.2009 | |
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 25.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3134945 (WERTHEIMER SIDNEY B) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,14 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 25 *; | [X]FR1577298 (MATTIOLI LUCIEN) [X] 1,4,9,10,14,15 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 2 *; | [X]DE2558950 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US4180299 (TOLERSON LAWRENCE E [US]) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,14,15 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 30 *; | [X]US4627589 (HOTSUMI MINORU [JP]) [X] 1,8-10,14,15 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 12 *; | [X]EP0960781 (SHINTOM KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,10-12,14,15 * column 19, line 13 - column 21, line 10 *; | [X]WO0038951 (JOHNSON CONTROLS INTERIORS TEC [US], et al) [X] 14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2001012359 (GESTER RALF [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10,11,13,14 * paragraph [0029] * | by applicant | US5288049 |