EP1466298 - TRANSPONDER LABEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | Revocation of patent | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics idento GmbH Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 23 63322 Rödermark / DE | [2004/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GSCHWINDT, Andreas Rheinstrasse 32 64664 Alsbach-Hähnlein / DE | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Katscher, Helmut Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Dolivostrasse 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Katscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Fröbelweg 1 64291 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 02779411.4 | 25.09.2002 | [2004/42] | WO2002EP10711 | Priority number, date | DE20011048563 | 01.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10148563 | [2004/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03030093 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1466298 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1466298 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G06K19/077, H05K9/00 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
G06K19/07771 (EP);
G06K19/07749 (EP);
G06K19/0776 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPONDER-ETIKETT | [2004/42] | English: | TRANSPONDER LABEL | [2004/42] | French: | ETIQUETTE DE TRANSPONDEUR | [2004/42] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 25.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.2006
26.09.2006
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | 02
23.08.2006
26.09.2006
ADMISSIBLE Schreiner Group GmbH & Co. KG Bruckmannring 22 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE Opponent's representative Ettmayr, Andreas KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR Patentanwälte Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.2006
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 D-81677 München / DE | ||
02
23.08.2006
Schreiner Group GmbH & Co. KG Bruckmannring 22 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE Opponent's representative Ettmayr, Andreas Kehl & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | |||
Former [2006/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 D-81677 München / DE | 29.09.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.04.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.04.2007 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2007 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 30.09.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.10.2008 | 30.09.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.10.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.07.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | 26.07.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.07.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   26.07.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.11.2005 | CZ | 23.11.2005 | EE | 23.11.2005 | FI | 23.11.2005 | IE | 23.11.2005 | IT | 23.11.2005 | NL | 23.11.2005 | SK | 23.11.2005 | TR | 23.11.2005 | BG | 23.02.2006 | DK | 23.02.2006 | GR | 23.02.2006 | SE | 23.02.2006 | ES | 06.03.2006 | PT | 24.04.2006 | LU | 25.09.2006 | BE | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
EE | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
TR | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
LU | 25.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
EE | 23.11.2005 | ||
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | CZ | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SK | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
NL | 23.11.2005 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
NL | 23.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0354131 (POTTERS INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0590589 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19542900 (CUBIT ELECTRONICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 23 - line 49; figure 2 *; | [AD]DE20018648U (IDENTO IND KENNZEICHNUNG [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract * |