EP1443889 - OXIDATION COLOURING AGENT BASED ON BICYCLIC DEVELOPER COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSE, David Am Eichelkamp 223 40723 Hilden / DE | 02 /
HÖFFKES, Horst Carlo-Schmid-Str. 113 40595 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
MEINIGKE, Bernd Wuppertalstr. 84b 51381 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
KLEEN, Astrid Nordstrasse 17 40699 Erkrath / DE | [2004/33] | Application number, filing date | 02779547.5 | 11.11.2002 | [2004/33] | WO2002EP12559 | Priority number, date | DE20011056667 | 17.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10156667 | [2004/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03041672 | Date: | 22.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1443889 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1443889 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/41, A61K8/49, A61Q5/10 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
A61K8/4953 (EP);
A61K8/415 (EP);
A61K8/494 (EP);
A61Q5/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/33] | A61K7/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/33] | Title | German: | OXIDATIONSFÄRBEMITTEL AUF DER BASIS ZWEIKERNIGER ENTWICKLERKOMPONENTEN | [2004/33] | English: | OXIDATION COLOURING AGENT BASED ON BICYCLIC DEVELOPER COMPONENTS | [2004/33] | French: | COLORANTS D'OXYDATION A BASE DE REVELATEURS BICYCLIQUES | [2004/33] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 06.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.10.2009 | CZ | 14.10.2009 | DK | 14.10.2009 | EE | 14.10.2009 | FI | 14.10.2009 | IE | 14.10.2009 | IT | 14.10.2009 | NL | 14.10.2009 | SE | 14.10.2009 | SK | 14.10.2009 | TR | 14.10.2009 | LU | 11.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | BG | 14.01.2010 | GR | 15.01.2010 | ES | 25.01.2010 | PT | 15.02.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/44] | CY | 14.10.2009 | |
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
TR | 14.10.2009 | ||
LU | 11.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
LU | 11.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CZ | 14.10.2009 | |
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | DK | 14.10.2009 | |
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 25.01.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0011843 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-31* pages 9-11, line 26 *; | [X]WO9731886 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,10-31 * pages 21-22 *; | [A]DE19826457 (SCHWARZKOPF GMBH HANS [DE]) [A] 1-31 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]DE19847276 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-31 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]WO0061090 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1-31 * claims 8,9 *; | [X]WO0141717 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,10-31 * pages 30-31; claims 1-6 * | by applicant | GB1026978 | GB1153196 | DE2359399 | DE3723354 | DE3725030 | JPH0219576 | DE3843892 | DE3926344 | DE4133957 | WO9408969 | WO9408970 | WO9615765 | EP0740931 | DE19543988 | WO9731886 | WO0141717 | - CH. ZVIAK, The Science of Hair Care, pages 248 - 250 | - Oxidationsfarbstoffvorprodukte, pages 264 - 267 | - HRG.: CH., CULNAN; H. MAIBACH, Dermatology, VERLAG MARCEL DEKKER INC., (1986), vol. 7 |