EP1429947 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A BRAKE BOOSTER AMPLIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/39] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARLHE, Nicolas 27, avenue Liégeard F-93270 Sevran / FR | 02 /
LEBOUBE, Christophe 6, Square Marie Laurencin F-77680 Roissy en Brie / FR | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Bosch Systèmes de Freinage Service Brevets 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Bosch Systèmes de Freinage, 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 02779633.3 | 10.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002FR03065 | Priority number, date | FR20010012173 | 20.09.2001 Original published format: FR 0112173 | [2004/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03024760 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1429947 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1429947 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/56 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
B60T13/662 (EP,US);
B60T13/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE UND ANORDNUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER VERSTÄRKUNG EINER BREMSSERVO | [2004/26] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A BRAKE BOOSTER AMPLIFICATION | [2004/26] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETERMINATION DE L'AMPLIFICATION D'UN SERVOMOTEUR DE FREINAGE | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 18.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.09.2005 | CY | 28.09.2005 | CZ | 28.09.2005 | EE | 28.09.2005 | FI | 28.09.2005 | IE | 28.09.2005 | NL | 28.09.2005 | SK | 28.09.2005 | TR | 28.09.2005 | BG | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.12.2005 | GR | 28.12.2005 | SE | 28.12.2005 | PT | 28.02.2006 | [2016/21] |
Former [2010/20] | AT | 28.09.2005 | |
CY | 28.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2005 | ||
EE | 28.09.2005 | ||
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
TR | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2009/02] | AT | 28.09.2005 | |
CY | 28.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2005 | ||
EE | 28.09.2005 | ||
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
IT | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
TR | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 28.09.2005 | |
CZ | 28.09.2005 | ||
EE | 28.09.2005 | ||
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
IT | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
TR | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 28.09.2005 | |
CZ | 28.09.2005 | ||
EE | 28.09.2005 | ||
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
IT | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 28.09.2005 | |
CZ | 28.09.2005 | ||
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
IT | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 28.09.2005 | |
CZ | 28.09.2005 | ||
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 28.09.2005 | |
CZ | 28.09.2005 | ||
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
SK | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | CZ | 28.09.2005 | |
FI | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
BG | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4934249 (GAUTIER JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract ** column 6, line 48 - line 59 *; | [A]EP0487938 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0901948 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0982211 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * column 37, line 14 - line 54 * |