|
19.10.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
05.10.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
07.03.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2005 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2005 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
12.03.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.07.2003 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2003 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
6 |