EP1434913 - HIGHLY REPELLENT CARPET PROTECTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FITZGERALD, Patrick, Henry 640 Howard Avenue Pitman, NJ 08071 / US | 02 /
LIU, Andrew, Hen 6 E. Periwinkle Lane Newark, DE 19711 / US | 03 /
MURPHY, Peter, Michael 5024 Branston Road Ooltewah, TN 37363 / US | 04 /
STRICKLER, Charles, L. 192 Blake Road Elkton, MD 21921 / US | [2004/47] |
Former [2004/28] | 01 /
FITZGERALD, Patrick, Henry 640 Howard Avenue Pitman, NJ 08071 / US | ||
02 /
LIU, Andrew, Hen 119 Chapel Hill Drive Newark, DE 19711 / US | |||
03 /
MURPHY, Peter, Michael 5024 Branston Road Ooltewah, TN 37363 / US | |||
04 /
STRICKLER, Charles, L. 192 Blake Road Elkton, MD 21921 / US | Representative(s) | Morf, Jan Stefan, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Morf, Jan Stefan, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München (Bogenhausen) / DE | Application number, filing date | 02780488.9 | 09.10.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002US33398 | Priority number, date | US20010973101 | 09.10.2001 Original published format: US 973101 | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03031715 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434913 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1434913 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/576, C08G18/28, C08G18/70 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
C08G18/7831 (EP,US);
D06M15/576 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/2885 (EP,US);
D06M2200/11 (EP,US);
D06M2200/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23986 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2938 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2967 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31562 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2189 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2197 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2238 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2246 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2893 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/04] |
Former [2004/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHABWEISENDE TEPPICHSCHUTZMITTEL | [2004/28] | English: | HIGHLY REPELLENT CARPET PROTECTANTS | [2004/28] | French: | PROTECTANTS DE TAPIS A GRAND POUVOIR REPULSIF | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 07.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0110922 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8,11-19,27-29 * example -; claims 1-5,9,11-13; table 2 * * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 18 * * page 12, lines 6-10 * * page 13, lines 26-30 * * page 14, lines 1-8 * * page 15, lines 20-24 * * page 15, lines 30-33 * * page 21, lines 20-26 * * page 22, lines 6-10 * * page 13, line 19 - page 14, line 10 * * page 6, lines 1-18 * * page 8, lines 2-12 * [Y] 4,6,7,9,10; | [Y]WO9744375 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 4,6,7,9,10 * page 14, paragraph 1 * * page 12, paragraph 4 * * page 24; examples 1-39,100,108 * * claim - *; | [Y]EP0458356 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 4,6,7,9,10 * examples 1-38; claims 1-3,9 * * page 3, lines 38-56 *; | [Y]US4504401 (MATSUO MASASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 6,7 * example -; claims 5,7 * * column 5, lines 21-36 * * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 6 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 56 *; | [A]US5414111 (KIRCHNER JACK R [US]) [A] 1-19,27-29 * the whole document * |