EP1438868 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR APPROXIMATING HALF DUPLEX WIRELESS DISPATCH SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGGENTI, Mark 2480 Cordero Road Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 02 /
ROSEN, Eric, C. 611 Calle Paula Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | [2004/45] |
Former [2004/30] | 01 /
MAGGENTI, Mark 7254 Shoreline Drive, 137 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | ||
02 /
ROSEN, Eric, C. 611 Calle Paula Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 02780522.5 | 23.10.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002US34018 | Priority number, date | US20010999744 | 23.10.2001 Original published format: US 999744 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03037010 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1438868 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/28 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
H04W84/08 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANNÄHERUNG AN EIN HALBDUPLEX BÜNDELFUNKSYSTEM | [2004/30] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR APPROXIMATING HALF DUPLEX WIRELESS DISPATCH SYSTEM | [2004/30] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE RAPPROCHEMENT D'UN SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION SANS FIL SEMI-DUPLEX | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 01.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/43] | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0033469 (CONEXANT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,8,16,20,24,30 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 15 ** page 3, line 29 - page 5, line 33 *; | [X]GB2344726 (SIMOCO INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1,8,16,20,24,30 * page 2, line 22 - page 4, line 29 * * page 6, line 36 - page 7, line 22 *; | [X]WO0069190 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [X] 1,8,16,20,24,30 * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 17 * |