EP1458460 - GAS SCRUBBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weinbren, Milton Lawrence 24 Sandhurst Estate, Empire Place 2196 Sandhurst / ZA | [2004/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Wallace, Sheila Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Wallace, Sheila Jane Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02781588.5 | 26.11.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002IB04937 | Priority number, date | ZA20010010511 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: ZA 200110511 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03053543 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1458460 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D47/10, B01D50/00, B01D45/12 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
B01D45/12 (EP,US);
B01D47/10 (EP,US);
B01D50/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASWÄSCHER | [2004/39] | English: | GAS SCRUBBER | [2004/39] | French: | EPURATEUR DE GAZ | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/12] | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1082989 (HONDA CANADA INC [CA]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-12,14 * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 3 * * column 5, line 2 - column 6, line 22; figures 2,5 *; | [X]US4171961 (WINTERS HEINRICH [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,11,14 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 2 * * column 5, lines 3-45 * * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 26; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US4624688 (VATUNEN MARKKU T [FI]) [X] 1,2,6,9,11,14 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 54; figure 1 *; | [A]US3802162 (DEANE C) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 50; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0134838 (JERVENPEE VILJO JUHANA) [A] 1-14 * page 4, paragraph 6 - page 6, paragraph 2; figure . *; | [A]US5017203 (COX JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 7, line 23 - column 10, line 20; figure 9 *; | [A]US4157249 (NAMY GERALD [FR]) [A] 1-14 * column 2, lines 3-65 * * column 4, lines 7-59 * |