EP1463908 - LAMP AND HEADLIGHT FOR SIMPLE MOUNTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2004/41] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
LI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIESLER-WITTIG, Helmut c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
WINGS, Leo c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02781628.9 | 12.12.2002 | [2004/41] | WO2002IB05303 | Priority number, date | DE2002100831 | 02.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10200831 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03056237 | Date: | 10.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463908 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1463908 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F21V19/00 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
F21S41/192 (EP,US);
H01K1/46 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAMPE UND SCHEINWERFER FÜR EINE EINFACHE BEFESTIGUNG | [2004/41] | English: | LAMP AND HEADLIGHT FOR SIMPLE MOUNTING | [2004/41] | French: | LAMPE ET PHARE A FIXATION SIMPLE | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 20.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.04.2008 | BE | 16.04.2008 | CY | 16.04.2008 | CZ | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | EE | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IT | 16.04.2008 | NL | 16.04.2008 | SI | 16.04.2008 | SK | 16.04.2008 | TR | 16.04.2008 | BG | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | ES | 27.07.2008 | PT | 16.09.2008 | IE | 12.12.2008 | LU | 12.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
TR | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
IE | 12.12.2008 | ||
LU | 12.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
IE | 12.12.2008 | ||
LU | 12.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
IE | 12.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 16.04.2008 | |
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 16.04.2008 | |
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 16.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DXAY]WO9712385 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [DX] 1-3,7-11 * page 5, line 30 - line 31 * * page 6, line 13 - line 22 * * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 5 * * page 7, line 24 - page 9, line 18 * * page 10, line 8 - line 27 * * figures 1-3,5 * [A] 5,6,12 [Y] 4; | [DA]WO9808021 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0893647 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 27 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]DE19815984 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [YA]FR2799528 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4 * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 12 * * figure 2 * [A] 1; | [A]US6328455 (HELBIG PETER [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9712385 | WO9808021 | DE29823160U | DE19815984 | JP2000077036 |