EP1571929 - A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ANTIOXIDANT CONSERVE FROM INDIAN CURRY LEAVES (MURRAYA KOENIGII SPRENG.) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research Rafi Marg New Delhi 100 001 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states COUNCIL OF SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH Rafi Marg New Delhi 100 001 / IN | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states COUNCIL OF SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH Rafi Marg New Delhi 100 001 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Lingamallu Jagan Mohan Central Food & Tecnological Research Inst., Mysore 570 013 Karnataka / IN | 02 /
RAMALAKSHMI, Kulathooran Central Food & Technological Res. Inst., Mysore 570 013 Karnataka / IN | 03 /
BORSE, Babasaheb Bhaskarrao Central Food & Technological Res. Inst., Mysore 570 013 Karnataka / IN | 04 /
RAGHAVAN, Bashyam Central Food & Technological Res. Inst., Mysore 570 013 Karnataka / IN | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Mattsson, Niklas Awapatent AB Drottninggatan 97 P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Mattsson, Niklas Awapatent AB Drottninggatan 97 P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 02781668.5 | 18.12.2002 | [2005/37] | WO2002IB05445 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004054391 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1571929 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571929 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23L3/3463, A23L3/3472 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
A61K36/75 (EP,US);
A23B7/154 (EP,US);
A23L3/3463 (EP,US);
A23L3/3472 (EP,US);
A61K47/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/37] | A23L3/3463, A23L3/3472, A61K35/78 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ANTIOXIDANTEN AUS CURRY-BLÄTTERN (MURRAYA KOENIGII SPRENG.) | [2005/37] | English: | A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF ANTIOXIDANT CONSERVE FROM INDIAN CURRY LEAVES (MURRAYA KOENIGII SPRENG.) | [2005/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN CONSERVATEUR ANTIOXYDANT A PARTIR DE FEUILLES DE CURRY (MURRAYA KOENIGII SPRENG.) | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 15.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2008 | BE | 23.07.2008 | CY | 23.07.2008 | CZ | 23.07.2008 | DK | 23.07.2008 | EE | 23.07.2008 | FI | 23.07.2008 | NL | 23.07.2008 | SI | 23.07.2008 | SK | 23.07.2008 | TR | 23.07.2008 | BG | 23.10.2008 | SE | 23.10.2008 | GR | 24.10.2008 | ES | 03.11.2008 | IE | 18.12.2008 | LU | 18.12.2008 | PT | 23.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CY | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
TR | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 18.12.2008 | ||
LU | 18.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CY | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 18.12.2008 | ||
LU | 18.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 18.12.2008 | ||
LU | 18.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 18.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
IE | 18.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
BE | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 23.07.2008 | |
ES | 03.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08225420 ; | [X]JPH08242814 ; | [A]US4380506 (KIMURA YUKICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]WO0232440 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 4 * * page 6 - page 12, line 6; claim - *; | [X] - TACHIBANA Y., "Antioxidative activity of carbazoles from Murraya koenigii leaves", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2001), vol. 49, no. 11, pages 5589 - 5594, XP002250357 [X] 1,7,10-12 * abstract * * page 5589 * * page 5590, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf010621r | [X] - RAMSEWAK R., "Biologically active carbazole alkaloids from Murraya koenigii", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 47, no. 2, pages 444 - 447, XP002250358 [X] 7-12 * page 444 * * page 447, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf9805808 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08225420 A 19960903 (INAHATA KORYO KK;NIPPON FUNMATSU YAKUHIN KK) [X] 1-12 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08242814 A 19960924 (INAHATA KORYO KK) [X] 7-12 * abstract * | [XD] - SETHI V, "EFFECT OF ADDITION OF SPICE EXTRACTS AND FLAVOURING COMPOUNDS ON THE KEEPING QUALITY OF TOMATO JUICE STORED IN DIFFERENT CONTAINERS", INDIAN FOOD PACKER, BOMBAY, IN, (1991), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 0019-4808, pages 17 - 18, XP000946721 [XD] 7-12 * page 17 - page 18 * | [X] - KHAN B A ET AL, "ANTI-OXIDANT EFFECTS OF CURRY LEAF, MURRAYA KOENIGII AND MUSTARD SEEDS, BRASSICA JUNCEA IN RATS FED WITH HIGH FAT DIET", INDIAN JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, XX, XX, (199702), vol. 35, no. 2, ISSN 0019-5189, pages 148 - 150, XP001000380 [X] 7-12 * page 148 * |