EP1450513 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2013/33] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NODA, Takurou Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Makoto Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
IGARASHI, Tatsuya Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2013/15] |
Former [2004/35] | 01 /
NODA, Takurou Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
SATO, Makoto Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
03 /
IGARASHI, Tatsuya Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Representative(s) | Davies, Simon Robert, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Davies, Simon Robert, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2004/35] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, Dr., et al D. Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02781800.4 | 18.11.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002JP12002 | Priority number, date | JP20010360370 | 27.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001360370 | JP20020269952 | 17.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002269952 | [2004/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03047173 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1450513 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1450513 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04W12/04, G06F13/00, // H04L29/06 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
H04L12/2856 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04W12/50 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/09] | H04L12/28, G06F13/00, // H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2004/35] | H04L12/28, G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/15] |
Former [2004/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN | [2004/35] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD | [2004/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2003 | Translation filed | 11.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 31.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0957651 (SECTRA COMMUNICATIONS AB [SE]) [X] 1-10* the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2001111543 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2001156704 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [XE]JP2002351766 (DENSO CORP) | by applicant | EP0957651 |