EP1451690 - MONITORING SYSTEM FOR A CORPORATE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMPAGNA, Matthew, J. 23 Langstroth Drive Trumbull, CT 06877 / US | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02782207.1 | 21.10.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US33793 | Priority number, date | US20010021454 | 29.10.2001 Original published format: US 21454 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03038622 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1451690 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/30 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
H04L43/00 (EP,US);
H04L63/0245 (EP,US);
H04L63/0272 (EP,US);
H04L63/029 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN FIRMENNETZWERK | [2004/36] | English: | MONITORING SYSTEM FOR A CORPORATE NETWORK | [2004/36] | French: | SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE POUR UN RESEAU EN PARALLELE | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/06] | 16.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9916205 (AEGISOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 1 ** page 8, line 22 - page 10, line 7 *; | [X]WO0163881 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claims 1,2,5,7 * | International search | [A]US6233685 (SMITH SEAN WILLIAM [US], et al) |