EP1404287 - HAIR LOTION STIMULATING HAIR GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basri, Fatima Campagne l'Evêque Bâtiment 7 Bd Ledru-Rollin 13015 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/16] | For all designated states Basri, Fatima Campagne l'Evêque Bâtiment 7 Bd Ledru-Rollin 13015 Marseille / FR | ||
Former [2005/12] | For all designated states Kadri, Ahmed 61, rue des Musardises 13015 Marseille / FR | ||
For all designated states Basri, Fatima Campagne l'Evêque Bâtiment 7 Bd Ledru-Rollin 13015 Marseille / FR | |||
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Guermi, Salim 130, impasse Féraud Augustin, Quartier des Carabains 13270 Fos-sur-Mer / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kadri, Ahmed 61,rue des Musardises 13015 Marseille / FR | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/12] | 01 /
Guermi, Salim 130 impasse Féraud Augustin Quartier des Carabains 13270 Fos-sur-Mer / FR | ||
Former [2004/15] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Roman, Michel Cabinet Roman 35, rue Paradis B.P. 30064 13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Roman, Michel CABINET ROMAN, 35, rue Paradis, B.P. 2224 13207 Marseille Cédex 01 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02782463.0 | 03.07.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002FR02314 | Priority number, date | FR20010008795 | 03.07.2001 Original published format: FR 0108795 | [2004/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03003992 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1404287 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/19, A61K8/20, A61K8/97, A61Q7/00 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/20 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61Q7/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/15] | A61K7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAARLOTION, DIE DEN HAARWUCHS VERSTÄRKT | [2004/15] | English: | HAIR LOTION STIMULATING HAIR GROWTH | [2004/15] | French: | LOTION CAPILLAIRE FAVORISANT LA REPOUSSE DES CHEVEUX | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 10.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/31] | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2844614 (CZYPULL ALFRED) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]CH682217 (LINDA SINGER DOLLA [CH]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A] - ANONYME, "aussie hair salad", ARTICLE INTERNET, URL: http://www.epinions.com/content_84116999812, (20030205), XP002229953 [A] 1-4 * paragraphe "Ingredients" * |