EP1573856 - MULTIPLE-BAND ANTENNA WITH PATCH AND SLOT STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEN, Geyi 532 Buckingham Blvd. Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2V1 / CA | 02 /
JARMUSZEWSKI, Perry 392 Arden Place Waterloo, Ontario N2L 2N7 / CA | 03 /
STEVENSON, Adam, D. 901 Foxbrook Ct. Kitchener, Ontario, N2P 2W1 / CA | [2006/23] |
Former [2005/37] | 01 /
WEN, Geyi 532 Buckingham Blvd. Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2V1 / CA | ||
02 /
JARMUSZEWSKI, Perry 392 Arden Place Waterloo, Ontario N2L 2N7 / CA | |||
03 /
STEVENSON, Adam, D. 6-19 Amos Avenue Waterloo, Ontario N2L 2W6 / CA | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/37] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4JP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02782564.5 | 28.11.2002 | [2005/37] | WO2002CA01842 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004049501 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1573856 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1573856 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/38 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
H01Q5/371 (EP,US);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q13/10 (EP,US);
H01Q5/10 (EP,US);
H01Q5/307 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0407 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0414 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0421 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | 28.06.2005 | LT | 28.06.2005 | LV | 28.06.2005 | MK | 28.06.2005 | RO | 28.06.2005 | SI | 28.06.2005 | Title | German: | MEHRFACHBAND-ANTENNE MIT PATCH- UND SCHLITZSTRUKTUREN | [2005/37] | English: | MULTIPLE-BAND ANTENNA WITH PATCH AND SLOT STRUCTURES | [2005/37] | French: | ANTENNES A BANDES MULTIPLES AVEC STRUCTURES DE CONNEXION ET A FENTES RAYONNANTES | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 20.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.04.2007 | 23.04.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07123010.6 / EP1914831 | EP10185738.1 / EP2320517 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.06.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2008 | BE | 28.05.2008 | CY | 28.05.2008 | CZ | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | EE | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | SK | 28.05.2008 | TR | 28.05.2008 | BG | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | ES | 08.09.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | IE | 28.11.2008 | LU | 28.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CY | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
TR | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.11.2008 | ||
LU | 28.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CY | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.11.2008 | ||
LU | 28.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.11.2008 | ||
LU | 28.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 28.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
BG | 28.08.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
EE | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SK | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
ES | 08.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 08.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6140966 (PANKINAHO ILKKA [FI]) [A] 1-27 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]EP1172885 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-27 * figure 2 * * abstract *; | [A]US6408190 (YING ZHINONG [SE]) [A] 1-27 * figure 4 ** abstract * | Examination | EP1026774 | US6157348 | WO0227862 | WO0227859 | EP1241733 | EP1258944 |