EP1438274 - PRODUCTION OF WATER-FREE NITROCELLULOSE AND EXPLOSIVE SUBSTANCES THAT HAVE A SPHEROIDAL SHAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bowas AG für Industrievertrieb Industriestrasse 13b 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states Bowas AG für Industrievertrieb Industriestrasse 13b 6300 Zug / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Gerhard Lanzinger Feld 28 84431 Rattenkirchen / DE | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Rupprecht, Kay, Dipl.-Ing. Meissner, Bolte & Partner, Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02782986.0 | 23.10.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002EP11850 | Priority number, date | DE2001152396 | 24.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10152396 | [2004/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03035581 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1438274 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C06B21/00 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
C08L1/18 (EP,US);
C06B21/00 (KR);
C06B21/0066 (EP,US);
C06B25/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG WASSERFREIER NITROCELLULOSE UND EXPLOSIVSTOFFE IN SPHÄROIDER FORM | [2004/30] | English: | PRODUCTION OF WATER-FREE NITROCELLULOSE AND EXPLOSIVE SUBSTANCES THAT HAVE A SPHEROIDAL SHAPE | [2004/30] | French: | PRODUCTION DE NITROCELLULOSE ANHYDRE ET DE MATIERES EXPLOSIVES SOUS FORME SPHEROIDALE | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS5790001 ; | [Y]DE701493 (WESTERN CARTRIDGE CO) [Y] 5 * page 3, line 59 - line 79; claim - *; | [A]GB746705 (OLIN MATHIESON) [A] 1,8* claim - *; | [Y]GB792848 (OLIN MATHIESON) [Y] 5 * page 3, line 14 - line 52 *; | [XY]US2982643 (REINHARDT CHARLES M) [X] 1,6,7,10-15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5,8,9; | [Y]US3723207 (CAMP A) [Y] 2,3,8,9 * claim - *; | [X]US4031172 (ZEIGLER EDWARD H) [X] 10-15 * example 1; claim - *; | [X]WO0048722 (VORLOP KLAUS DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 16 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 18 * * page 11, line 24 - line 26; claim - *; | [X]EP1031547 (PRIMEX TECH INC [US]) [X] 10-15 * claim - *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 28, Database accession no. 1982-58152E, XP002237897 & JPS5790001 A 19820604 (DAICEL CHEM INDS LTD) [Y] 2,3,8,9 * abstract * |