EP1481072 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING LOW MOLECULAR FERMENTATION PRODUCTS FROM MIXTURES OF SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA-Messo GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 134 47229 Duisburg-Rheinhausen / DE | [2005/27] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states MESSO-CHEMIETECHNIK GMBH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 134 47229 Duisburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Günter Bitburger Strasse 13 47259 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Manfred Handwerkerstrasse 9 66740 Saarlouis / DE | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02783031.4 | 29.10.2002 | [2004/49] | WO2002EP12053 | Priority number, date | DE20011053805 | 05.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10153805 | [2004/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03040380 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1481072 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/54 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
C12P7/46 (EP);
C12J1/04 (EP);
C12M33/14 (EP);
C12M47/10 (EP);
C12P7/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABTRENNUNG VON NIEDERMOLEKULAREN VERGÄRUNGSPRODUKTEN AUS STOFFGEMISCHEN | [2004/49] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING LOW MOLECULAR FERMENTATION PRODUCTS FROM MIXTURES OF SUBSTANCES | [2004/49] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SEPARATION DE PRODUITS DE FERMENTATION DE FAIBLE POIDS MOLECULAIRE A PARTIR DE MELANGES DE SUBSTANCES | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 28.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 30.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.09.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | 28.09.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.09.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   28.09.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5503750 (RUSSO JR LAWRENCE J ET AL) [X] 1-8 * column 9, line 46 - line 67 * * column 20, line 11 - line 17 * * claims 1-20 *; | [X]DE4212187 (FRAUNHOFER GESELLSCHAFT) [X] 1-8 * abstract *; | [X] - PARK Y S ET AL, "ACETIC ACID PRODUCTION USING A FERMENTOR EQUIPPED WITH A HOLLOW FIBER FILTER MODULE", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (1989), vol. 33, no. 7, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 918 - 923, XP002245742 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260330305 | [X] - HAN I S ET AL, "Nanofiltration of model acetate solutions", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBL.COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19951115), vol. 107, no. 1, ISSN 0376-7388, pages 107 - 113, XP004041244 [X] 8 * abstract * * figures 6,7 * * Kapitel 3.5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0376-7388(95)00107-N | [X] - TIMMER J M K ET AL, "TRANSPORT OF LACTIC ACID THROUGH REVERSE OSMOSIS AND NANOFILTRATIONMEMBRANES", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBL.COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19931101), vol. 85, no. 2, ISSN 0376-7388, pages 205 - 216, XP000490124 [X] 8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0376-7388(93)85169-W |