EP1450854 - VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISIS INNOVATION LIMITED University Offices, Wellington Square Oxford OX1 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states ISIS INNOVATION LIMITED University Offices, Wellington Square Oxford OX1 2JD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAIDLAW, Stephen, Institute for Animal Health Compton Laboratory, Compton Newbury, Berks RG20 7NN / GB | 02 /
SKINNER, Mike, Institute for Animal Health ComptonLaboratory, Compton Newbury, Berks RG20 7NN / GB | 03 /
HILL, Adrian, University of Oxford University Offices, Wellington Square Oxford OX1 2JD / GB | 04 /
GILBERT, Sarah, University of Oxford University Offices, Wellington Square Oxford OX1 2JD / GB | 05 /
ANDERSON, Richard, University of Oxford UniversityOffices, Wellington Square Oxford OX1 2JD / GB | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2004/36] | Richards, William John, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02783253.4 | 02.12.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002GB05411 | Priority number, date | GB20010028733 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: GB 0128733 | US20010334649P | 30.11.2001 Original published format: US 334649 P | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03047617 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1450854 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/275, C12N15/86, A61K39/12, C12N7/00 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
A61K39/04 (EP,GB,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,GB,US);
A61K39/015 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/275 (EP,GB,US);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
C12N15/8633 (GB);
C12N7/00 (EP,GB,US);
A61K2039/523 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5254 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US);
A61K2039/58 (EP,US);
A61K2039/585 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPFSTOFF | [2004/36] | English: | VACCINE | [2004/36] | French: | VACCIN | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 12.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/28] | 20.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9303145 (VIROGENETICS CORP [US]); |