|
01.04.2019 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
129 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
129 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
126 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
126 |
|
28.06.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2017 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
127 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
127 |
|
02.09.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2016 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
03.06.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
123 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
77 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
123 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2006 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
77 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
19.05.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
65 |
|
02.02.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Refund of fees (PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.01.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.11.2003 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.10.2003 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
243 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.02.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.01.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
10.12.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.12.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
35 |
|
10.12.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
110 |
|
10.12.2002 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
20 |
|
10.12.2002 |
Sequence listing |
International Searching Authority |
77 |